Truck Drivers and Helpers Local Union No. 355 Health & Welfare Fund v. Estate of Mark A. Delinski et al
Plaintiff: Truck Drivers and Helpers Local Union No. 355 Health & Welfare Fund
Defendant: Estate of Mark A. Delinski, Clifford Hardwick, Eric Delinski, Hardwick & Harris Escrow Account, Cynthia L Delinski, Hardwick & Harris, LLP and Personal Injury Trust for the Benefit of the Beneficiaries of Mark A. Delinski
Case Number: 1:2019cv03213
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 Correspondence re: Status Report by Clifford Hardwick (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MARGINAL ORDER Granting #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 11/18/2019. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Truck Drivers and Helpers Local Union No. 355 Health & Welfare Fund (Barnaskas, Shauna)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re: Posting of bond. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 11/12/2019. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 Motion Hearing held on 11/8/2019 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Truck Drivers and Helpers Local Union No. 355 Health & Welfare Fund before Judge Richard D. Bennett.(Court Reporter: Martin Giordano) (sd3, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for TRO and/or Preliminary Injunction and for Accelerated Discovery. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 11/8/2019. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Lynn Bradley on behalf of Truck Drivers and Helpers Local Union No. 355 Health & Welfare Fund (Bradley, Kimberly)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to All Defendants. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Truck Drivers and Helpers Local Union No. 355 Health & Welfare Fund (Barnaskas, Shauna)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Truck Drivers and Helpers Local Union No. 355 Health & Welfare Fund (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Barnaskas, Shauna)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8334712.), filed by Truck Drivers and Helpers Local Union No. 355 Health & Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Barnaskas, Shauna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Truck Drivers and Helpers Local Union No. 355 Health & Welfare Fund v. Estate of Mark A. Delinski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Truck Drivers and Helpers Local Union No. 355 Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Shauna Marie Barnaskas
Represented By: Corey Smith Bott
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Mark A. Delinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Hardwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Delinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardwick & Harris Escrow Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia L Delinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardwick & Harris, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Personal Injury Trust for the Benefit of the Beneficiaries of Mark A. Delinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?