Weisel v. Kaimetrix, LLC
Plaintiff: Ms. Janice Weisel and Janice A. Weisel
Defendant: LLC Kaimetrix, LLC and Kaimetrix, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03281
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Kaimetrix, LLC.(Liskow, James)
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Janice A. Weisel. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sadri, Jeffrey)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER. The SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE that was previously set in for 12/20/19 is POSTPONED pending resolution of the newly-filed motion (ECF No. 10). Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 12/10/2019. (vdcs, Chambers)
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Kaimetrix, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Liskow, James)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 Correspondence re: Proposed Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(vdcs, Chambers)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 11/15/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4-7) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR ANNE ARUNDEL COUNTY. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Removal by Kaimetrix, LLC. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Kaimetrix, LLC.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kaimetrix, LLC.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Kaimetrix, LLC filed by Janice A. Weisel.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Kaimetrix, LLC (Liskow, James)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 RESPONSE re #1 Notice of Removal, Response to Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Kaimetrix, LLC.(Liskow, James)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County, case number C-02-CV-19-003575. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8349758), filed by Kaimetrix, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Liskow, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weisel v. Kaimetrix, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLC Kaimetrix, LLC
Represented By: James S Liskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaimetrix, LLC
Represented By: James S Liskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Janice Weisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice A. Weisel
Represented By: Paul V Bennett
Represented By: Jeffrey J Sadri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?