Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company v. Cutting Edge Floor Covering, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Cutting Edge Floor Covering, Inc., Phillip Wallace, Jr. and Lawrence Stewart
Case Number: 1:2019cv03297
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint redline version)(Campsen, Marc)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss as filed by Deft Cutting Edge Floor Covering, Inc. filed by Phillip Wallace, Jr.(Brown, Augustus)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Cutting Edge Floor Covering, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Quinn, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. Phillip Wallace, Jr served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019.(Campsen, Marc)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. Cutting Edge Floor Covering, Inc. served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019.(Campsen, Marc)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Phillip Wallace, Jr.(Brown, Augustus)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Cutting Edge Floor Covering, Inc., Lawrence Stewart and Phillip Wallace, Jr.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company (Campsen, Marc)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8352189.), filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Cutting Edge Floor Covering, Inc., #3 Summons Lawrence Stewart, #4 Summons Phillip Wallace, Jr.)(Campsen, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company v. Cutting Edge Floor Covering, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutting Edge Floor Covering, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Wallace, Jr.
Represented By: Augustus F Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Marc Andrew Campsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?