Brown et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Na'Shae Brown and Kya Holmes
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Bank One, N.A. f/k/a The First National Bank of Chicago and Bank One, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03301
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L. Boardman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 12/5/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2019 Filing 18 Correspondence re: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Statement in Response to Standing Order Concerning Removal (Blumenfeld, Michael)
November 25, 2019 Filing 16 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Gales, Bryan)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 11/25/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #12 Notice (Other. Na'Shae Brown and Kya Holmes must correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, consent forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Filings >Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2019 Filing 12 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by Na'Shae Brown, Kya Holmes (Brown, Brian) Modified on 11/21/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 11/19/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. or counsel for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/3/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4-9) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Removal to United States District Court by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bank One, N.A. and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by Kya Holmes and Na'Shae Brown. (Attachments: #1 Redline Complaint)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Bank One. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bank One, N.A. and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Bank One, N.A., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by Kya Holmes, Na'Shae Brown.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Gales on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Gales, Bryan)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Filing Notice of Removal in Circuit Court for Baltimore City (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Michael)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-19-005102. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8352583), filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Blumenfeld, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Bryan Gales
Represented By: Michael Evan Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank One, N.A. f/k/a The First National Bank of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank One, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Na'Shae Brown
Represented By: Brian S Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kya Holmes
Represented By: Brian S Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?