Mitchell v. Janney Montgomery Scott LLC
Plaintiff: Todd E. Mitchell
Defendant: Janney Montgomery Scott LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03308
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L. Boardman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:207
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Other Relief Confirming Arbitration Award by Todd E. Mitchell (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Donovan, Priscilla)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jill Clarke. Directing attorney Jill Clarke to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/9/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jill Clarke (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8437549.) by Todd E. Mitchell(Donovan, Priscilla)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Todd E. Mitchell. Janney Montgomery Scott LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020.(Donovan, Priscilla)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Janney Montgomery Scott LLC.(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 11/18/2019. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman. Todd E. Mitchell or counsel for Todd E. Mitchell are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/2/2019. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Janney Montgomery Scott LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8354383.), filed by Todd E. Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Claimant's Statement of Claim in FINRA Action, #3 Exhibit Claimant's Submission Agreement in FINRA Action, #4 Exhibit Answer of Janney Montgomery Scott in FINRA Action, #5 Exhibit Submission Agreement of Janney Montgmery Scott in FINRA Action, #6 Exhibit 2019-6-19 Order of Arbitrator re service on personal representative, #7 Exhibit 2019-6-28 Certificate of Service on personal representative, #8 Exhibit 2019-7-7 Order of Arbitrator that personal representative could respond by deadline, #9 Exhibit 2019-7-12 Certicate of service of arbitrator's order of 7-7-2019 on personal representative, #10 Exhibit FINRA Arbitrator's Award Granting Expungement dated 9-12-2019, #11 Exhibit FINRA Code section 13805, #12 Exhibit FINRA Rule 2080, #13 Exhibit Waiver request to FINRA and FINRA's Granting of Waiver of Its Right to Be Party to Confirmation Proceeding, #14 Summons)(Donovan, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Janney Montgomery Scott LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janney Montgomery Scott LLC
Represented By: Jill Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd E. Mitchell
Represented By: Priscilla Alden Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?