Scott v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA. et al
Plaintiff: Durrell Scott
Defendant: AIG Claims Inc., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA., AIG Property Casualty Insurance Agency Inc. and Gerardo Rafael Cruz-Ramos
Case Number: 1:2019cv03343
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 31 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint by Gerardo Rafael Cruz-Ramos.(Mantzavinos, Megan)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMENDED ORDER dismissing Plaintiff's claims as to AIG Claims, Inc. and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 1/13/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
January 13, 2020 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM to Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 1/13/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
January 13, 2020 Filing 28 Correspondence re: Memorandum and Order (Ravenell, Kenneth)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 -VACATED- ORDER granting #12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Directing that the case be closed. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 1/9/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 1/13/2020 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
January 10, 2020 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 1/9/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
January 7, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE by AIG Claims Inc., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA. (Mantzavinos, Megan)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER directing that if Defendants National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA and AIG Claims, Inc. intention is to rely upon their original response, as supplemented in their Reply, then they shall so notify the Court by 01/17/2020; if not, then Defendants may file a motion by the same date for leave to late-file their response. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 1/3/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
January 2, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AIG Claims Inc., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA..(Mantzavinos, Megan)
December 23, 2019 Filing 22 QC NOTICE: 21 Response in Support of Motion filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA., AIG Claims Inc. was filed incorrectly. ***Please re-file using the event under Responses and Replies > Reply to Response to Motion. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Issued 21 days as to Gerardo Rafael Cruz-Ramos. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2019 Filing 19 Correspondence re: Summons (Ravenell, Kenneth)
December 10, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Durrell Scott. (Attachments: #1 Redlined Complaint)(Ravenell, Kenneth)
December 10, 2019 Filing 17 QC NOTICE: 14 Amended Complaint filed by Durrell Scott needs to be corrected. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. The following corrective actions are needed regarding missing or incomplete information: **Redline copy has not been filed. Please re-file the clean version of the amended complaint as the main document and the redline version as an attachment to the amended complaint. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 Request for Hearing (Ravenell, Kenneth)
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Durrell Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Ravenell, Kenneth)
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #4 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by AIG Claims Inc., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA..(Mantzavinos, Megan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by AIG Claims Inc., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Mantzavinos, Megan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA. identifying Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc. for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA..(Mantzavinos, Megan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by AIG Claims Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc. for AIG Claims Inc..(Mantzavinos, Megan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 QC NOTICE: 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by AIG Claims Inc., 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by AIG Claims Inc. was filed incorrectly. *****Please re-file the document by selecting Other Filings > Other Documents > Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. ***Please enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 11/22/2019. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by AIG Claims Inc., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mantzavinos, Megan)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 11/21/2019. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 JOINT Notice of Substitution of Party by Durrell Scott (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against AIG Claims Inc., AIG Property Casualty Insurance Agency Inc., filed by Durrell Scott. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24C19005171. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8361166), filed by AIG Claims Inc., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Mantzavinos, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Claims Inc.
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA.
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty Insurance Agency Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerardo Rafael Cruz-Ramos
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Durrell Scott
Represented By: Kenneth W Ravenell
Represented By: Tomeka Grimes Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?