East Texas Boot Company, LCC v. Under Armour, Inc.
Plaintiff: East Texas Boot Company, LCC
Defendant: Under Armour, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03400
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Referring Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Steven W Ritcheson. Directing attorney Steven W Ritcheson to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/13/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 13, 2020 Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jacqueline K Burt. Directing attorney Jacqueline K Burt to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/13/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 13, 2020 Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Travis Lynch. Directing attorney Travis Lynch to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/13/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 13, 2020 Filing 16 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Steven W. Ritcheson by East Texas Boot Company, LCC. The fee has already been paid.(Cubello, Kristofer)
January 13, 2020 Filing 15 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jacqueline K. Burt by East Texas Boot Company, LCC. The fee has already been paid.(Cubello, Kristofer)
January 13, 2020 Filing 14 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Travis E. Lynch by East Texas Boot Company, LCC. The fee has already been paid.(Cubello, Kristofer)
January 13, 2020 Filing 13 QC NOTICE: #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by East Texas Boot Company, LCC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 QC NOTICE: #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by East Texas Boot Company, LCC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 QC NOTICE: #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by East Texas Boot Company, LCC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Travis E. Lynch (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8443152.) by East Texas Boot Company, LCC(Cubello, Kristofer)
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Steven W. Ritcheson (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8443132.) by East Texas Boot Company, LCC(Cubello, Kristofer)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jacqueline K. Burt (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8443106.) by East Texas Boot Company, LCC(Cubello, Kristofer)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 12/19/2019. (jw2s, Chambers)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time Defendant Under Armour, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Under Armour, Inc.(MacWilliams, Michael)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by East Texas Boot Company, LCC. Under Armour, Inc. served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019.(Cubello, Kristofer)
November 30, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. Judge George Levi Russell, III no longer assigned to the case. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 26, 2019 Jury Trial Demand by East Texas Boot Company, LCC(bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Under Armour, Inc..(bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by East Texas Boot Company, LCC (bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Under Armour, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637119610.), filed by East Texas Boot Company, LCC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Summons, #18 Civil Cover Sheet)(bas, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: East Texas Boot Company, LCC v. Under Armour, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Texas Boot Company, LCC
Represented By: Marc Seldin Rosen
Represented By: Kristofer Patrick Cubello
Represented By: Travis E Lynch
Represented By: Jacqueline K Burt
Represented By: Steven W Ritcheson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Under Armour, Inc.
Represented By: Michael B MacWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?