Allstate Insurance Company v. Gingles et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Murray Green, Daimya Gingles and Daisy Realty, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03410
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: J Mark Coulson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 5:8705
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Murray Green served on 1/18/2020, answer due 2/10/2020.(Smith, Adam)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 11/27/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Allstate Insurance Company or counsel for Allstate Insurance Company are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/11/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Daisy Realty, LLC, Daimya Gingles, Murray Green.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Supplemental to #1 Complaint, filed by Allstate Insurance Company Exhibit B (Smith, Adam)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 Supplemental to #1 Complaint, filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY (Smith, Adam)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation, Other Affiliate Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC for ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Smith, Adam)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8373345.), filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Daisy, #3 Summons Green, #4 Summons Gingles)(Smith, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Gingles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimya Gingles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daisy Realty, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Adam Gregory Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?