Soda v. U.S. Office of Personnel Management et al
Plaintiff: Frank Rocco Soda
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II, United States Department of the Treasury, Steven Mnuchin, United States Department of Labor, Eugene Scalia, U.S. Office of Personnel Management, United States Department of Health and Human Services and Dale Cabaniss
Case Number: 1:2019cv03423
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000bb
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank Rocco Soda. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 Correspondence from Frank Soda re: Request for Additional Summons Copies for Secretaries and Departments of Labor and Treasury (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Reissued as to Steven Mnuchin, Eugene Scalia, United States Department of Labor, United States Department of the Treasury. (c/m to Plaintiff 12/26/2019 ols, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/26/2019 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 Correspondence from Frank Soda re: Request for Summons to be Reissued (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Frank Rocco Soda as to Steven Mnuchin, Eugene Scalia, United States Department of Labor, United States Department of the Treasury. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank Rocco Soda. Alex M. Azar, II served on 12/11/2019, answer due 2/10/2020; Dale Cabaniss served on 12/11/2019, answer due 2/10/2020; U.S. Office of Personnel Management served on 12/11/2019, answer due 2/10/2020; United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 12/11/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 60 days as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (c/m to Plaintiff 12/5/2019 ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing Clerk to take all necessary steps to issue summons and to return summons to plaintiff. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 12/5/2019. (c/m 12/5/2019 ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637119615.), filed by Frank Rocco Soda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (ols, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soda v. U.S. Office of Personnel Management et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Mnuchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Scalia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Office of Personnel Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Cabaniss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Rocco Soda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?