Hughley v. JetBlue Airways Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Bianca A. Hughley
Defendant: Adrian Lopez and JetBlue Airways Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv03523
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Reissued 21 days as to JetBlue Airways Corporation. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
February 5, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Adrian Lopez served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE proposed summons by Bianca A. Hughley (ols, Deputy Clerk)
January 30, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to JetBlue Airways Corporation. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to JetBlue Airways Corporation, Adrian Lopez. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Granting Plaintiff 21 days from the date of this Order to complete the U.S. Marshal forms and return them to the Clerk. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 1/9/2020. (c/m as directed 1/9/2020 ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bianca A. Hughley (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JetBlue Airways Corporation, Adrian Lopez, filed by Bianca A. Hughley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (ols, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughley v. JetBlue Airways Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bianca A. Hughley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?