Clarendon National Insurance Company v. Dan Ryan Builders, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Clarendon National Insurance Company, successor by merger to Sussex Insurance Company, f/k/a Companion Specialty Insurance Company and Clarendon National Insurance Company
Defendant: Dan Ryan Builders West Virginia, LLC, f/k/a Dan Ryan Builders, Inc., Dan Ryan Builders South Carolina, LLC, Dan Ryan Builders, Inc. and Dan Ryan Builders West Virginia, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03527
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Referring Judge: A David Copperthite
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT re #27 Response in Opposition to Motion Declaration of Paul Amirata by Clarendon National Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Yaron, George)
February 6, 2020 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT re #27 Response in Opposition to Motion Declaration of George D. Yaron by Clarendon National Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Yaron, George)
February 6, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Change Venue Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Clarendon National Insurance Company.(Yaron, George)
February 6, 2020 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT re #24 Response in Opposition to Motion Declaration of Paul Amirata by Clarendon National Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Yaron, George)
February 6, 2020 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT re #24 Response in Opposition to Motion Declaration of George D. Yaron by Clarendon National Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Yaron, George)
February 6, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Join Indispensable Parties filed by Clarendon National Insurance Company.(Yaron, George)
February 3, 2020 Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of George D Yaron. Directing attorney George D Yaron to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/3/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 3, 2020 Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jenna E Settino. Directing attorney Jenna E Settino to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/3/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 30, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for George D. Yaron (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8484931.) by Clarendon National Insurance Company(Kelly, Robert)
January 30, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jenna E. Settino (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8484790.) by Clarendon National Insurance Company(Kelly, Robert)
January 29, 2020 Filing 19 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Dan Ryan Builders West Virginia, LLC identifying Other Affiliate DRB Enterprises LLC for Dan Ryan Builders West Virginia, LLC.(McCloskey, Stephen)
January 29, 2020 Filing 18 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Dan Ryan Builders South Carolina, LLC identifying Other Affiliate DRB Enterprises LLC for Dan Ryan Builders South Carolina, LLC.(McCloskey, Stephen)
January 29, 2020 Filing 17 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Dan Ryan Builders, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Dan Ryan Builders West Virginia, LLC, f/k/a Dan Ryan Builders, Inc., Other Affiliate DRB Enterprises LLC for Dan Ryan Builders, Inc..(McCloskey, Stephen)
January 23, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Change Venue by Dan Ryan Builders South Carolina, LLC, Dan Ryan Builders West Virginia, LLC, Dan Ryan Builders, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McCloskey, Stephen)
January 23, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Join Indispensable Parties by Dan Ryan Builders South Carolina, LLC, Dan Ryan Builders West Virginia, LLC, Dan Ryan Builders, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McCloskey, Stephen)
January 23, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Clarendon National Insurance Company by Dan Ryan Builders South Carolina, LLC, Dan Ryan Builders West Virginia, LLC, Dan Ryan Builders, Inc..(McCloskey, Stephen)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Consent Motion to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint.. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 1/9/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
January 8, 2020 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Dan Ryan Builders South Carolina, LLC, Dan Ryan Builders West Virginia, LLC, Dan Ryan Builders, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCloskey, Stephen)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clarendon National Insurance Company. Dan Ryan Builders South Carolina, LLC served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020; Dan Ryan Builders West Virginia, LLC served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020; Dan Ryan Builders, Inc. served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020.(Kelly, Robert)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 QC NOTICE: #9 Affidavit of Service filed by Clarendon National Insurance Company, #7 Affidavit of Service filed by Clarendon National Insurance Company, #8 Affidavit of Service filed by Clarendon National Insurance Company was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event used. Refile as one entry, using the event "Summons returned executed" and input the service date for each party when prompted by the system. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
December 31, 2019 Filing 9 [FILED IN ERROR] AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action; Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet served on Dan Ryan Builders West Virginia, LLC, f/k/a Dan Ryan Builders, Inc. on 12/20/2019, filed by Clarendon National Insurance Company.(Kelly, Robert) Modified on 1/3/2020 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
December 31, 2019 Filing 8 [FILED IN ERROR] AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action; Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet served on Dan Ryan Builders, Inc. on 12/20/2019, filed by Clarendon National Insurance Company.(Kelly, Robert) Modified on 1/3/2020 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 [FILED IN ERROR] AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action; Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet served on Dan Ryan Builders South Carolina, LLC on 12/18/2019, filed by Clarendon National Insurance Company.(Kelly, Robert) Modified on 1/3/2020 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
December 26, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 12/12/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Clarendon National Insurance Company or counsel for Clarendon National Insurance Company are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/26/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Dan Ryan Builders South Carolina, LLC, Dan Ryan Builders West Virginia, LLC, Dan Ryan Builders, Inc..(krs, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Clarendon National Insurance Company, successor by merger to Sussex Insurance Company, f/k/a Companion Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Kenmare Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Enstar Holdings (US) LLC, Corporate Parent Enstar USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Enstar (US Asia-Pac) Holdings Ltd., Corporate Parent Enstar Holdings Limited for Clarendon National Insurance Company, successor by merger to Sussex Insurance Company, f/k/a Companion Specialty Insurance Company.(Kelly, Robert)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8399642.), filed by Clarendon National Insurance Company, successor by merger to Sussex Insurance Company, f/k/a Companion Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to: Dan Ryan Builders, Inc., #3 Summons to: Dan Ryan Builders West Virginia, LLC, f/k/a Dan Ryan Builders, Inc., #4 Summons to: Dan Ryan Builders South Carolina, LLC)(Kelly, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clarendon National Insurance Company v. Dan Ryan Builders, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarendon National Insurance Company, successor by merger to Sussex Insurance Company, f/k/a Companion Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Noon Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarendon National Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Noon Kelly
Represented By: George D Yaron
Represented By: Jenna E Settino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Ryan Builders West Virginia, LLC, f/k/a Dan Ryan Builders, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Ryan Builders South Carolina, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Salvatore McCloskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Ryan Builders, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Salvatore McCloskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Ryan Builders West Virginia, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Salvatore McCloskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?