Good Omen Bottling, LLC v. Mobtown Fermentation LLC
Plaintiff: Good Omen Bottling LLC and Good Omen Bottling, LLC
Defendant: Mobtown Fermentation LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03545
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Good Omen Bottling, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 2/6/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Good Omen Bottling, LLC (Gaumont, Robert)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark re Deficiency Notice - AO 120, (Gaumont, Robert)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Mobtown Fermentation LLC.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2019 Deficiency Notice -- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 12/19/2019 (slss, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mobtown Fermentation LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8402656.), filed by Good Omen Bottling LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Gaumont, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Good Omen Bottling, LLC v. Mobtown Fermentation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobtown Fermentation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Good Omen Bottling LLC
Represented By: Robert A Gaumont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Good Omen Bottling, LLC
Represented By: Robert A Gaumont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?