Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage d/b/a Mr. Cooper and Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00035
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Referring Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MARGINAL ORDER granting #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 1/31/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Krupp, Staci)
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020.(Krupp, Staci)
January 9, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Judge Catherine C. Blake no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage d/b/a Mr. Cooper identifying Other Affiliate First American Title Insurance Company for Nationstar Mortgage d/b/a Mr. Cooper.(Krupp, Staci)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8438078.), filed by Nationstar Mortgage d/b/a Mr. Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Summons, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Krupp, Staci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage d/b/a Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Staci Jeanne Krupp
Represented By: Martin Harold Schreiber, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Staci Jeanne Krupp
Represented By: Martin Harold Schreiber, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?