Hood-Wilson v. Community College of Baltimore County
Plaintiff: Melanie Hood-Wilson
Defendant: Community College of Baltimore County
Case Number: 1:2020cv00124
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Referring Judge: J Mark Coulson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Melanie Hood-Wilson. Community College of Baltimore County waiver sent on 1/24/2020, answer due 3/24/2020.(Ford, Yaida)
January 28, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Community College of Baltimore County or counsel for Community College of Baltimore County are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 2/10/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent P Jackson on behalf of Community College of Baltimore County (Jackson, Vincent)
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernadette Hunton on behalf of Community College of Baltimore County (Hunton, Bernadette)
January 22, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Reissued as to Community College of Baltimore County. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Melanie Hood-Wilson re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Defendant's Counsel)(Ford, Yaida)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 1/15/2020. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Melanie Hood-Wilson or counsel for Melanie Hood-Wilson are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 1/29/2020. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Community College of Baltimore County.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Community College of Baltimore County, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8455755.), filed by Melanie Hood-Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Ford, Yaida) Modified on 1/15/2020 (slss, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hood-Wilson v. Community College of Baltimore County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Hood-Wilson
Represented By: Yaida O Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community College of Baltimore County
Represented By: Bernadette Hunton
Represented By: Vincent P Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?