Watkins v. Baltimore City et al
Plaintiff: Nafiz Watkins
Defendant: Fatima Patterson, Oiuyemi Abiodun, Baltimore City, Hall, John Doe, The Deputy Warden for Security at Baltimore City Booking and Intake Center, Kevin Hickson, Solomon, Crawford, Jane Doe, The Secretary of the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services, The Medical Administrator of Baltimore City Booking and Intake Center, Jackson, Allen, Warden, The Commissioner of the Division of Pretrial Detention and Services, Telp, Captain Hines, The Warden of Baltimore City Booking and Intake Center, Iesha Butler and Thomas Williams, .
Case Number: 1:2020cv00208
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Nafiz Watkins (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration)(bas, Deputy Clerk)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 3/11/2020. (c/m 3/11/2020 bas, Deputy Clerk)
March 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to and including March 18, 2020 by The Office of the Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ryden, David)
February 26, 2020 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Nafiz Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Ryden on behalf of The Office of the Attorney General (Ryden, David)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint,, filed by Nafiz Watkins ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments; Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 2/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Institutional Coordinator Letter) (c/m 2/12/2020 bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 Correspondence received from Nafiz Watkins re: Case Status. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Nafiz Watkins(bas, Deputy Clerk)
January 29, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Nafiz Watkins(bas, Deputy Clerk)
January 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Nafiz Watkins (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(bas, Deputy Clerk)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing the Finance Officer to file within 21 days an Inmate Account Summary Information Sheet for the past six months of Plaintiff's incarceration; Dismissing without prejudice #3 Motion for Production of Documents. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 1/29/2020. (c/m 1/29/2020 bas, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Production of Documents by Nafiz Watkins(bas, Deputy Clerk)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nafiz Watkins(bas, Deputy Clerk)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oiuyemi Abiodun, Allen, Baltimore City, Iesha Butler, Crawford, Jane Doe, John Doe, Hall, Kevin Hickson, Hines, Jackson, Fatima Patterson, Solomon, Telp, The Commissioner of the Division of Pretrial Detention and Services, The Deputy Warden for Security at Baltimore City Booking and Intake Center, The Medical Administrator of Baltimore City Booking and Intake Center, The Secretary of the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services, The Warden of Baltimore City Booking and Intake Center, Warden, Thomas Williams, filed by Nafiz Watkins.(bas, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins v. Baltimore City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fatima Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oiuyemi Abiodun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Deputy Warden for Security at Baltimore City Booking and Intake Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Hickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Secretary of the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Medical Administrator of Baltimore City Booking and Intake Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Commissioner of the Division of Pretrial Detention and Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Warden of Baltimore City Booking and Intake Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iesha Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Williams, .
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nafiz Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?