Ackermann v. Mitchell et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Sebastien Ackermann
Defendant: The Honorable Shirley M. Watts, Honorable Joseph M. Getty, The Honorable Patricia Mitchell, The former Honorable Micheal D. Mason, Honorable Robert N. McDonald, Honorable Michele D. Hotten, Chief Justice Mary Ellen Barbera, The former Honorable Sally D. Adkins, Mary Lynn and The former Honorable Clayton Greene, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00337
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Nathan Sebastien Ackermann (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 Correspondence re: Request for Subpoena of Records by Nathan Sebastien Ackermann. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Summons by Nathan Sebastien Ackermann. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Envelope)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing of Corrected Civil Cover Sheet by Nathan Sebastien Ackermann. (Attachments: #1 Amended Civil Cover Sheet)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Nathan Sebastien Ackermann. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sally D. Adkins, Mary Ellen Barbera, Joseph M. Getty, Clayton Greene, Jr, Michele D. Hotten, Mary Lynn, Micheal D. Mason, Robert N. McDonald, Patricia Mitchell, Shirley M. Watts ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 84637035877.), filed by Nathan Sebastien Ackermann. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Certificate of Service, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Envelope)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ackermann v. Mitchell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Honorable Shirley M. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honorable Joseph M. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Honorable Patricia Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The former Honorable Micheal D. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honorable Robert N. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honorable Michele D. Hotten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Justice Mary Ellen Barbera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The former Honorable Sally D. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The former Honorable Clayton Greene, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Sebastien Ackermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?