Minor et al v. Union Carbide Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Stephen P Minor, Karen L. Minor and Stephen P. Minor
Defendant: General Electric Company, Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Refractories Co., Alfa Laval, Inc., Koppers Company, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Pfizer, Inc., Crane Co., Phelps Packing and Rubber Co., John Crane-Houdaille, Inc., Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc., Pecora Corporation, A.W. Chesterton Company, J.H. France Refractories Co., E.L. Stebbings & Co., Inc., Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Siemens Demag Delaval Turbomachinery, Inc., The Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust, Viking Pump, Paramount Packing & Rubber, Inc., Beazer East, Inc., Cope-Vulcan, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Certainteed Corporation, Lloyd E. Mitchell, Inc., Cooper Industries, Inc., International Paper Company, Universal Refractories Company, Hampshire Industries, Inc., Corning Incorporated, Crown, Cork and Seal Co., Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Goulds Pumps (IPG) LLC, Owen-Illinois Glass Co., The Nash Engineering Company, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, MCIC, Inc, CBS Corporation, The William Powell Company and IMO Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00406
Filed: February 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 30 PAPERLESS Order Approving #29 Stipulation for Use at Trial. (Blake, Catherine)
March 20, 2020 Filing 29 STIPULATION For Use At Trial by Stephen P. Minor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Stipulation (List of U.S. Naval Ships))(Nolan, Stephen)
March 16, 2020 Filing 28 Correspondence re: Courtesy Copies of Lengthy Filings per Local Rules (Nolan, Stephen)
March 13, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Plaintiffs from Conducting an Additional Deposition of Plaintiff Stephen Minor, #26 MOTION Leave to Reopen Deposition of Terminally Ill Plaintiff Response in Opposition to Certain Defs' Motion for Protective Order filed by Stephen P. Minor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Stephen P. Minor, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Affidavit Robert Moss, M.D., #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Defs' Motion for Protective Order)(Nolan, Stephen)
March 13, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION Leave to Reopen Deposition of Terminally Ill Plaintiff by Stephen P. Minor (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Stephen P. Minor, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Robert Moss, M.D., #4 Exhibit Counsel's Rule 104.7 Certificate of Compliance, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re Pls' Motion to Reopen Deposition)(Nolan, Stephen)
March 2, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Plaintiffs from Conducting an Additional Deposition of Plaintiff Stephen Minor by CBS Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, Union Carbide Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Kulinski, Philip)
February 25, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R Schroll on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand Company (Schroll, Matthew)
February 25, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE by CBS Corporation of Independent Grounds for 28 U.S.C. 1442(a)(1)-Based "Federal Officer" Jurisdiction and Joinder in Removal of Claim Filed By General Electric Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Maisano, Clare)
February 24, 2020 Filing 22 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group plc, Other Affiliate Foster Wheeler Corporation for Foster Wheeler LLC.(Quigg, David)
February 24, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip A Kulinski on behalf of CBS Corporation (Kulinski, Philip)
February 21, 2020 Filing 20 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation identifying Other Affiliate NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate National Amusements Inc. for CBS Corporation.(Maisano, Clare)
February 21, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Marie Maisano on behalf of CBS Corporation (Maisano, Clare)
February 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Quigg on behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC (Quigg, David)
February 19, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by General Electric Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, Exhibits D301-D314 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit)(Meringer, Donald)
February 19, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by General Electric Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, Exhibits D276-D300 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D-276 2019-10-01 Minor, Stephen - JH France Refractories Co.'s Notice of Automatic Dismissal re Plaintiff Minor, #2 Exhibit Exhibit D-277 2019-10-01 Minor, Stephen - Paramount Packing & Rubber, Inc.'s Notice of Adoption (Plaintiff Minor), #3 Exhibit Exhibit D-278 2019-10-02 Minor, Stephen - Notice of Automatic of Dismissal Copes Vulcan, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-279 2019-10-03 Minor, Stephen - Notice of Automatic Dismissal of Cross Claims Corning Inc., #5 Exhibit Exhibit D-280 2019-10-04 Minor, Stephen - Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.'s Notice Of Automatic Dismissal Of Cross Claims, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D-281 2019-10-04 Minor, Stephen - Notice of Automatic Dismissal SB Decking, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D-282 2019-10-04 Minor, Stephen - Phelps Packing & Rubber Company, Inc.'s Notice of Automatic Dismissal, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D-283 2019-10-10 Minor, Stephen - Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Witness list, #9 Exhibit Exhibit D-284 2019-10-15 Minor, Stephen - Corning Inc.'s, on behalf of its former Corhart Refractories business division, Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc., #10 Exhibit Exhibit D-285 2019-10-16 Minor, Stephen - Plaintiff's stipulation of Dismissal - Koppers Co. Inc. only, #11 Exhibit Exhibit D-286 2019-10-18 Minor, Stephen - Lloyd E. Mitchell, Inc.'s Notice of Automatic Dismissal of Cross-Claims (Minor), #12 Exhibit Exhibit D-287 2019-10-18 Minor, Stephen - Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of The WM Powell Company, #13 Exhibit Exhibit D-288 2019-10-23 Minor, Stephen - Plaintiff's Stipulation of DIsmissal of Siemens Delaval Demag Turbomachinery Inc. ONLY, #14 Exhibit Exhibit D-289 2019-10-25 Minor, Stephen - John Crane Inc.'s Notice of Automatic Dismissal of Cross-Claims, #15 Exhibit Exhibit D-290 2019-10-31 Minor, Stephen - CBS Corporation's Notice of Intention to Pursue Cross Claims and Third Party Claims, #16 Exhibit Exhibit D-291 2019-10-31 Minor, Stephen - Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Nash Engineering Company Only, #17 Exhibit Exhibit D-292 2019-10-31 Minor, Stephen - Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Pecora Corporation Only, #18 Exhibit Exhibit D-293 2019-11-06 Minor, Stephen - The WM Powell Company's Notice of Automatic Dismissal of Cross-Claims, #19 Exhibit Exhibit D-294 2019-11-12 Minor, Stephen - Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of Third-Party Claims against Hopeman Brothers, Inc., ONLY, #20 Exhibit Exhibit D-295 2019-11-14 Minor, Stephen - Nash Engineering Company's Notice of Automatic Dismissal of Cross Claims, #21 Exhibit Exhibit D-296 2019-11-14 Minor, Stephen - Pecora Corporation's Notice of Automatic Dismissal of Cross Claims, #22 Exhibit Exhibit D-297 2020-01-06 Minor, Stephen - Joint Stipulation of Dismissal for Bayer CropScience, Inc., #23 Exhibit Exhibit D-298 2020-01-07 Minor, Stephen - Stipulation of Dismissal As To Crane Co. Only, #24 Exhibit Exhibit D-299 2020-01-16 Minor, Stephen - Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant Goulds Pumps Inc. nka Goulds Pumps LLC (Stephen Minor), #25 Exhibit Exhibit D-300 2020-01-16 Minor, Stephen - Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Viking Pump, Inc., ONLY)(Meringer, Donald)
February 19, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by General Electric Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, Exhibits D251-D275 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D-251 2019-09-11 Minor, Stephen - Stipulation of Dismissal as to Pfizer Inc., #2 Exhibit Exhibit D-252 2019-09-12 Minor, Stephen - Plaintiffs' Notice of Service Of Discovery Material, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D-253 2019-09-12 Minor, Stephen - Plaintiffs' Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc., #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-254 2019-09-12 Minor, Stephen - Plaintiffs Stephen and Karen Minor's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Air And Liquid Systems Corporation, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D-255 2019-09-12 Minor, Stephen - Stipulation of Dismissal as to Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (FKA Square D Company), #6 Exhibit Exhibit D-256 2019-09-12 Minor, Stephen - WGAST Stip of Dismissal, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D-257 2019-09-13 Minor, Stephen - Stipulation of Dismissal as to International Paper Co., #8 Exhibit Exhibit D-258 2019-09-16 Minor, Stephen - Stipulation of Dismissal dismissing JH France Refractories Co. from the claim of Stephen P. Minor, #9 Exhibit Exhibit D-259 2019-09-16 Minor, Stephen - Stipulation of Dismissal dismissing Paramount Packing & Rubber, Inc. from the claim of Stephen P. Minor, #10 Exhibit Exhibit D-260 2019-09-16 Minor, Stephen - Stipulation Of Dismissal Of Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc., #11 Exhibit Exhibit D-261 2019-09-18 Minor, Stephen - Joint Stipulation of Dismissal - Copes-Vulcan, Inc., #12 Exhibit Exhibit D-262 2019-09-18 Minor, Stephen - Joint Stipulation of Dismissal-SB Decking, Inc., #13 Exhibit Exhibit D-263 2019-09-18 Minor, Stephen - Stipulation of Dismissal of John Crane Inc., #14 Exhibit Exhibit D-264 2019-09-18 Minor, Stephen - Uniroyal, Inc.'s Identification of Crossclaims, #15 Exhibit Exhibit D-265 2019-09-18 Minor, Stephen - Uniroyal, Inc.'s Master Answer to Third Party Complaints, #16 Exhibit Exhibit D-266 2019-09-20 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service_Viking Pump, #17 Exhibit Exhibit D-267 2019-09-20 Minor, Stephen - Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Phelps Packing and Rubber Co., Inc., #18 Exhibit Exhibit D-268 2019-09-23 Minor, Stephen - Stipulation of Dismissal as to E.L. Stebbing & Co., Inc., #19 Exhibit Exhibit D-269 2019-09-23 Minor, Stephen - Stipulation of Dismissal as to MCIC, Inc., #20 Exhibit Exhibit D-270 2019-09-25 Minor, Stephen - Stipulation of dismissal of Hampshire Industries, Inc., #21 Exhibit Exhibit D-271 2019-09-25 Minor, Stephen - Stipulation of Dismissal of Lloyd E. Mitchell, Inc. (Minor), #22 Exhibit Exhibit D-272 2019-09-27 Minor, Stephen - Notice of Automatic Dismissal of Cross-Claims Against Alfa Laval Inc., #23 Exhibit Exhibit D-273 2019-09-27 Minor, Stephen - Notice of Automatic Dismissal of Cross-Claims Against Cooper Industries, LLC, #24 Exhibit Exhibit D-274 2019-09-27 Minor, Stephen - Notice of Automatic Dismissal of Crossclaims Against Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (fka Square D Company), #25 Exhibit Exhibit D-275 2019-09-27 Minor, Stephen - Notice of Automatic Dismissal of Cross-Claims Against Pfizer Inc.)(Meringer, Donald)
February 19, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by General Electric Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, Exhibits D226-D250 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D-226 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - Phelps Packing & Rubber Company, Inc.'s Identification of Crossclaims, #2 Exhibit Exhibit D-227 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - The WM Powell Company's Identification of Cross-Claims, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D-228 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - Third-Party Complaint of E.L. Stebbing & Co., Inc., #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-229 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust's Identification of Cross and Third-Party Defendants, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D-230 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen P. - General Electric Company's Identification of Claims for Contribution and or Indemnity, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D-231 2019-08-06 Minor, Stephen - Cross Claim of SB Decking, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D-232 2019-08-06 Minor, Stephen - Hampshire ID of Cross Claims, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D-233 2019-08-06 Minor, Stephen - REFILED-Defendants' Identification of Cross Claims (Certainteed, Copes-Vulcan, SB Decking), #9 Exhibit Exhibit D-234 2019-08-07 Minor, Stephen - Bayer CropScience, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Claims, #10 Exhibit Exhibit D-235 2019-08-07 Minor, Stephen - Bayer CropScience, Inc.'s Cross-Claim Against Defendants and Third-Party Defendants, #11 Exhibit Exhibit D-236 2019-08-07 Minor, Stephen - Union Carbide Corporation's Answer to Cross-Claims, #12 Exhibit Exhibit D-237 2019-08-07 Minor, Stephen - Union Carbide Corporation's Cross-Claim Against Defendants and Third-Party Defendants, #13 Exhibit Exhibit D-238 2019-08-08 Minor, Stephen - Defendant Viking Pump, Inc.'s Identification of Cross-Claims, #14 Exhibit Exhibit D-239 2019-08-08 Minor, Stephen - Short Form Answer of Defendant Viking Pump, Inc., #15 Exhibit Exhibit D-240 2019-08-09 Minor, Stephen - Defendants' Motion to Classify Identification of Cross Claims As Timely Filed, #16 Exhibit Exhibit D-241 2019-08-09 Minor, Stephen - proposed Order granting Defs' Motion to Classify Identification of Cross Claims as Timely Filed, #17 Exhibit Exhibit D-242 2019-08-15 Minor, Stephen - Third-Party Complaint of MCIC, Inc., #18 Exhibit Exhibit D-243 2019-08-30 Minor, Stephen - The WM Powell Company Signed Verification Page, #19 Exhibit Exhibit D-244 2019-08-30 Minor, Stephen - The WM Powell Company's Notice of Service, #20 Exhibit Exhibit D-245 2019-08-30 Minor, Stephen - The WM Powell Company's Response to Plaintiff's Request for Interrogatories, #21 Exhibit Exhibit D-246 2019-08-30 Minor, Stephen - The WM Powell Company's Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents, #22 Exhibit Exhibit D-247 2019-09-02 Minor, Stephen - Ingersoll-Rand Companys Identification of Claims for Contribution and or Indemnity, #23 Exhibit Exhibit D-248 2019-09-11 Minor, Stephen - Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Defendant Corning Inc., #24 Exhibit Exhibit D-249 2019-09-11 Minor, Stephen - Stipulation of Dismissal as to Alfa Laval, #25 Exhibit Exhibit D-250 2019-09-11 Minor, Stephen - Stipulation of Dismissal as to Cooper Industries, LLC)(Meringer, Donald)
February 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by General Electric Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, Exhibits D200-D225 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D-201 2019-08-02 Minor, Stephen - Stipulation regarding Plaintiff's time to respond to Hampshire's Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit Exhibit D-202 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - Alfa Laval Inc.'s Answer to Cross Claims, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D-203 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - Alfa Laval Inc.'s Cross Claims, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-204 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - Alfa Laval Inc.'s Third Party Complaint as to Manville, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D-205 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - Cooper Industries, LLC's Answer to Cross Claims, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D-206 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - Cooper Industries, LLC's Cross Claims, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D-207 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - Cooper Industries, LLC's Third Party Complaint as to Manville, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D-208 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - Corning Inc.'s Identification of Cross Claims, #9 Exhibit Exhibit D-209 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - Corning Inc.'s Third Party Complaint against Crown Cork and Seal and Universal Refractories, #10 Exhibit Exhibit D-210 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - Cross-Claim for Indemnity and-or Contribution or in the Alternative, Third-Party Complaint of E.L. Stebbing & Co., Inc., #11 Exhibit Exhibit D-211 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - Cross-Claim for Indemnity and-or Contribution or in the Alternative, Third-Party Complaint of MCIC, Inc., #12 Exhibit Exhibit D-212 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - Foster Wheeler LLC's Answer to Cross Claims, #13 Exhibit Exhibit D-213 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - Foster Wheeler LLC's Cross Claims, #14 Exhibit Exhibit D-214 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - Foster Wheeler LLC's Third Party Complaint as to Manville, #15 Exhibit Exhibit D-215 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - General Electric Company's Identification of Claims for Contribution and or Indemnity, #16 Exhibit Exhibit D-216 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - Identification of Parties Against Which Defendant Crane Co. will make Claims for Contribution, Set-off, or Indemnity, #17 Exhibit Exhibit D-217 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - Identification of Parties Against Which Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (formerly known as Square D Company) will make Claims for Contribution, Set-off, or Indemnity, #18 Exhibit Exhibit D-218 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - JH France Refractories Co.'s Identification of Cross-claims (Plaintiff Minor), #19 Exhibit Exhibit D-219 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - John Crane Inc.'s Identification of Cross-Claims, #20 Exhibit Exhibit D-220 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - Letter to Plaintiffs' Complaint regarding depositions, #21 Exhibit Exhibit D-221 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - Nash Engineering Company's Identification of Cross-Claims, #22 Exhibit Exhibit D-222 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - Paramount Packing & Rubber, Inc.'s Identification of Cross-claims (Plaintiff Minor), #23 Exhibit Exhibit D-223 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - Pfizer Inc.'s Answer to Cross Claims, #24 Exhibit Exhibit D-224 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - Pfizer Inc.'s Cross Claims, #25 Exhibit Exhibit D-225 2019-08-05 Minor, Stephen - Pfizer Inc.'s Third Party Complaint as to Manville)(Meringer, Donald)
February 19, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by General Electric Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, Exhibits D176-D200 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D-176 2019-06-28 Minor, Stephen - Defendant JH France Refractories Co.'s Answers to Plaintiff Minor's Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit Exhibit D-177 2019-06-28 Minor, Stephen - JH France Refractories Co.'s Responses to Plaintiff Minor's Request for Production of Documents, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D-178 2019-06-28 Minor, Stephen - Notice of Service Greene, Tweed & Co. Ans to Pls Discovery, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-179 2019-06-28 Minor, Stephen - Paramount Packing & Rubber, Inc.'s Answers to Plaintiff Minor's Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D-180 2019-06-28 Minor, Stephen - Paramount Packing & Rubber, Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiff Minor's Request for Production of Documents, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D-181 2019-07-01 Minor, Stephen - Defendant Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.'s Answers to Plaintiff's Case-Specific Interrogatories, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D-182 2019-07-01 Minor, Stephen - Defendant Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiff's Case-Specific Request for Production of Documents, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D-183 2019-07-01 Minor, Stephen - Plaintiff Stephen Minor's Answers to Defs' Master Set of Interrogatories, #9 Exhibit Exhibit D-184 2019-07-01 Minor, Stephen - Plaintiff Stephen Minor's Notice of Service of Discovery and Other Materials in Case no. 24X18000254, #10 Exhibit Exhibit D-185 2019-07-03 Minor, Stephen - Letter from Hampshire to Plaintiffs' Counsel regarding objections to Plaintiffs' ATIs, #11 Exhibit Exhibit D-186 2019-07-03 Minor, Stephen - Plaintiff Stephen Minor's Notice of Service of Document Production - Part One of Three Parts, #12 Exhibit Exhibit D-187 2019-07-03 Minor, Stephen - Plaintiff Stephen Minor's Notice of Service of Document Production - Part Three of Three Parts, #13 Exhibit Exhibit D-188 2019-07-03 Minor, Stephen - Plaintiff Stephen Minor's Notice of Service of Document Production - Part Two of Three Parts, #14 Exhibit Exhibit D-189 2019-07-08 Minor, Stephen - Motion Pro Hac Vice - Paul J. Smyth, #15 Exhibit Exhibit D-190 2019-07-08 Minor, Stephen - proposed Order admitting Paul J. Smyth, #16 Exhibit Exhibit D-191 2019-07-11 Minor, Stephen - Line by the Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust Withdrawing Notice of Deposition of Stephen P. Minor, #17 Exhibit Exhibit D-192 2019-07-11 Minor, Stephen - Notice of Deposition of Stephen P. Minor on Wednesday, August 7, 2019 at 1100 am, #18 Exhibit Exhibit D-193 2019-07-12 Minor, Stephen - Plaintiff Stephen Minor's Amended Cross Notice Relating To Rescheduling Of Video Deposition, #19 Exhibit Exhibit D-194 2019-07-16 Minor, Stephen - Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel regarding Motion to Compel, #20 Exhibit Exhibit D-195 2019-07-16 Minor, Stephen - Motion of Hampshire Industries, Inc., to Compel Complete Answers to Interrogatories, #21 Exhibit Exhibit D-196 2019-07-16 Minor, Stephen - Proposed Order Granting Hampshire's Motion to Compel, #22 Exhibit Exhibit D-197 2019-07-17 Minor, Stephen Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance on behalf of the Pecora Corporation, #23 Exhibit Exhibit D-198 2019-08-01 Minor, Stephen - Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc.'s (formerly known as Square D Company) Responses to Plaintiffs' Case-Specific Interrogatories, #24 Exhibit Exhibit D-199 2019-08-01 Minor, Stephen - Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc.'s (formerly known as Square D Company) Responses to Plaintiffs' Case-Specific Requests for Production of Documents, #25 Exhibit Exhibit D-200 2019-08-01 Minor, Stephen - Verification for Responses to Plaintiffs' Case-Specific Interrogatories)(Meringer, Donald)
February 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by General Electric Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, Exhibits D151-D175 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D-151 2019-04-19 Minor, Stephen - Greene, Tweed & Company's Cross Claim Against All Defendants, #2 Exhibit Exhibit D-152 2019-04-19 Minor, Stephen - Greene, Tweed & Company's Notice of Intention to Pursue Cross Claims, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D-153 2019-04-19 Minor, Stephen - Greene, Tweed & Company's Omnibus Response to Requests for Admission of Facts and Genuineness of Documents Propounded By Any and All Parties, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-154 2019-04-25 Minor, Stephen - Letter to Armand Volta, et al., regarding objections to proposed Minor Scheduling Order, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D-155 2019-05-01 Minor, Stephen - CBS Corporations Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Case Specific Interrogatories with Verification, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D-156 2019-05-01 Minor, Stephen - CBS Corporation's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Case Specific Request for Production of Documents, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D-157 2019-05-01 Minor, Stephen - International Paper Company's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Case Specific Interrogatories, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D-158 2019-05-01 Minor, Stephen - International Paper Company's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Case Specific Requests for Production of Documents, #9 Exhibit Exhibit D-159 2019-05-01 Minor, Stephen - International Paper Company's Verification in Support of Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Case Specific Interrogatories, #10 Exhibit Exhibit D-160 2019-05-01 Minor, Stephen - International Paper Company's Verification in Support of Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Case Specific Requests for Production of Documents, #11 Exhibit Exhibit D-161 2019-05-01 Minor, Stephen - Letter to Counsel Regarding Proposed Scheduling Order, #12 Exhibit Exhibit D-162 2019-05-01 Minor, Stephen - Nolan Reply Letter to D. Allen re Hampshire's Objection to Prop. PTO in S. Minor Living Meso Case, #13 Exhibit Exhibit D-163 2019-05-09 Minor, Stephen - Pre Trial Scheduling Order, #14 Exhibit Exhibit D-164 2019-05-15 Minor, Stephen - Ingersoll-Rand Company's Answer, #15 Exhibit Exhibit D-165 2019-05-15 Minor, Stephen - Ingersoll-Rand Company's Crossclaim, #16 Exhibit Exhibit D-166 2019-05-20 Minor, Stephen - Notice of Assignment, #17 Exhibit Exhibit D-167 2019-06-07 Minor, Stephen - Line Striking Attorney Appearance of Melanie J. Garner, #18 Exhibit Exhibit D-168 2019-06-12 Minor, Stephen - Notice of Deposition of Stephen P. Minor Case Affected Minor, #19 Exhibit Exhibit D-169 2019-06-17 Minor, Stephen - JH France Refractories Co.'s First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Minor, #20 Exhibit Exhibit D-170 2019-06-17 Minor, Stephen - Paramount Packing & Rubber, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Minor, #21 Exhibit Exhibit D-171 2019-06-17 Minor, Stephen - Plaintiff Stephen Minor's Cross Notice of Deposition By Videotape, #22 Exhibit Exhibit D-172 2019-06-24 Minor, Stephen - Notice of Service of Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company's Responses to Plaintiffs' Case-Specific Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents, #23 Exhibit Exhibit D-173 2019-06-26 Minor, Stephen - JH France Refractories Co.'s Responses to Plaintiff Minor's Request for Production of Documents, #24 Exhibit Exhibit D-174 2019-06-26 Minor, Stephen - Paramount Packing & Rubber, Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiff Minor's Request for Production of Documents, #25 Exhibit Exhibit D-175 2019-06-28 Minor, Stephen - Defendant Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiff's Case-Specific Request for Production of Documents)(Meringer, Donald)
February 19, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by General Electric Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, Exhibits D126-D150 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D-126 2018-12-31 Minor, Stephen - JH France Refractories Co.'s Cross-claims, #2 Exhibit Exhibit D-127 2019-01-03 Minor, Stephen - Bayer CropScience, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D-128 2019-01-03 Minor, Stephen - Union Carbide Corporation's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-129 2019-01-04 Minor, Stephen - Enter the Appearance of Rebekah S.W. Mears, Esquire as counsel for Defendant Pecora Corporation, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D-130 2019-01-04 Minor, Stephen - Pecora Corporation's Cross-Claims Against Defendants and Third-Party Defendants, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D-131 2019-01-04 Minor, Stephen - Pecora Corporation's Notice of Intention to Pursue Cross-Claims and Third-Party Claims, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D-132 2019-01-04 Minor, Stephen - Pecora Corporation's Omnibus Response to Requests for Admission of Facts and Genuineness of Documents, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D-133 2019-01-07 Minor, Stephen - Answer to Complaint and Request for Jury Trial, #9 Exhibit Exhibit D-134 2019-01-07 Minor, Stephen - Enter the Appearance of Rebekah S.W. Mears, Esquire as counsel for Defendant Pecora Corporation, #10 Exhibit Exhibit D-135 2019-01-07 Minor, Stephen - Pecora Corporation's Answer to Cross-Claims and Request for Jury Trial, #11 Exhibit Exhibit D-136 2019-01-07 Minor, Stephen - Pecora Corporation's Cross-Claims Against Defendants and Third-Party Defendants, #12 Exhibit Exhibit D-137 2019-01-07 Minor, Stephen - Pecora Corporation's Notice of Intention to Pursue Cross-Claims and Third-Party Claims, #13 Exhibit Exhibit D-138 2019-01-07 Minor, Stephen - Pecora Corporation's Omnibus Response to Requests for Admission of Facts and Genuineness of Documents, #14 Exhibit Exhibit D-139 2019-01-11 Minor, Stephen - Cooper Industries, LLC's Certificate Regarding Discovery, #15 Exhibit Exhibit D-140 2019-02-11 Minor, Stephen - Alfa Laval's Certificate Regarding Discovery, #16 Exhibit Exhibit D-141 2019-02-11 Minor, Stephen - Foster Wheeler's Certificate Regarding Discovery, #17 Exhibit Exhibit D-142 2019-02-11 Minor, Stephen - Pfizer Inc.'s Certificate Regarding Discovery, #18 Exhibit Exhibit D-143 2019-02-12 Minor, Stephen - The William Powell Company's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #19 Exhibit Exhibit D-144 2019-02-13 Minor, Stephen - Hampshire's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Minor Case for Trial in January, 2020, #20 Exhibit Exhibit D-145 2019-03-08 Minor, Stephen - JH France Refractories Co.'s Adoption of Hampshire Industries' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Set Trial Date, #21 Exhibit Exhibit D-146 2019-03-08 Minor, Stephen - Paramount Packing & Rubber, Inc.'s Adoption to Hampshire Industries' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Set Trial Date, #22 Exhibit Exhibit D-147 2019-03-29 Minor, Stephen - Opposition of CertainTeed, Copes-Vulcan, GE and SB Decking to Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Trial Date and Order Pre-trial Schedule, #23 Exhibit Exhibit D-148 2019-04-01 Minor, Stephen - Corning Inc., on behalf of its former Corhart Refractories business division's opposition to Plantiffs' Motion to Set Trial Date and Order Pre-Trial Schedule, #24 Exhibit Exhibit D-149 2019-04-19 Minor, Stephen - Greene, Tweed & Company's Adoption of All Relevant Motions of Co-Defendants and Co-Cross Defendants, #25 Exhibit Exhibit D-150 2019-04-19 Minor, Stephen - Greene, Tweed & Company's Answer to All Complaints, Amended Complaints, Deemed and Filed Cross Claims, Third Party Complaints, and or Fourth Party Complaints)(Meringer, Donald)
February 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by General Electric Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, Exhibits D101-D125 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D-101 2018-12-03 Minor, Stephen - Long Form Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, on behalf of Coope-Vulcan, Inc. (Stephen P. Minor), #2 Exhibit Exhibit D-102 2018-12-07 Minor, Stephen - AW Chesterton's Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D-103 2018-12-07 Minor, Stephen - Corhart Response to Request for Production of Documents of Stephen Minor, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-104 2018-12-10 Minor, Stephen - Corhart Answers to Interrogatories of Stephen Minor verification, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D-105 2018-12-10 Minor, Stephen - Corhart Answers to Interrogatories of Stephen Minor, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D-106 2018-12-10 Minor, Stephen - Corhart Response to Request for Production of Documents of Stephen Minor, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D-107 2018-12-10 Minor, Stephen - General Electric Company's Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D-108 2018-12-10 Minor, Stephen - Greene, Tweed & Co.'s Answer to Complaint, #9 Exhibit Exhibit D-109 2018-12-11 Minor, Stephen - General Electric Company's Answers to Plaintiff's Interrogatories, #10 Exhibit Exhibit D-110 2018-12-11 Minor, Stephen - General Electric Company's Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents, #11 Exhibit Exhibit D-111 2018-12-13 Minor, Stephen - JH France Refractories Co.'s Cross-claims, #12 Exhibit Exhibit D-112 2018-12-17 Minor, Stephen - Koppers Answer, #13 Exhibit Exhibit D-113 2018-12-17 Minor, Stephen - Koppers Crossclaim, #14 Exhibit Exhibit D-114 2018-12-17 Minor, Stephen - Koppers Interrogatories, #15 Exhibit Exhibit D-115 2018-12-17 Minor, Stephen - Koppers' Request for Production of Documents, #16 Exhibit Exhibit D-116 2018-12-26 Minor, Stephen - SHORT-FORM ANSWER TO SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT OF E.L. STEBBING & CO., INC., #17 Exhibit Exhibit D-117 2018-12-26 Minor, Stephen - SHORT-FORM ANSWER TO SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT OF MCIC, INC., #18 Exhibit Exhibit D-118 2018-12-27 Minor, Stephen - Defendant Goulds Pumps LLC's Answer to all Cross Claims and or Third Party Complaints (Stephen P. Minor), #19 Exhibit Exhibit D-119 2018-12-27 Minor, Stephen - Defendant Goulds Pumps LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint (Stephen P. Minor), #20 Exhibit Exhibit D-120 2018-12-28 Minor, Stephen - Defendant Alfa Laval Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #21 Exhibit Exhibit D-121 2018-12-28 Minor, Stephen - Defendant Cooper Industries, LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #22 Exhibit Exhibit D-122 2018-12-28 Minor, Stephen - Defendant Foster Wheeler LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #23 Exhibit Exhibit D-123 2018-12-28 Minor, Stephen - Defendant Pfizer Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #24 Exhibit Exhibit D-124 2018-12-31 Minor, Stephen - JH France Refractories Co.'s Answer to Cross-claims of All Co-defendants, #25 Exhibit Exhibit D-125 2018-12-31 Minor, Stephen - JH France Refractories Co.'s Answer to Short Form Complaint)(Meringer, Donald)
February 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by General Electric Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, Exhibits D076-D100 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D-076 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on Perryville Corp. (Foster Wheeler), #2 Exhibit Exhibit D-077 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on Pfizer, Inc., #3 Exhibit Exhibit D-078 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on Phelps Packing & Rubber Co., #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-079 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on SB Decking, Inc., #5 Exhibit Exhibit D-080 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on Siemens Demag Delaval Turbo, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D-081 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on Union Carbide Corporation, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D-082 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D-083 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Answer to Complaint and Request for Jury Trial, #9 Exhibit Exhibit D-084 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Nash Engineering Company's Answer to Cross-Claims and Request for Jury Trial, #10 Exhibit Exhibit D-085 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Nash Engineering Company's Cross-Claims Against Defendants and Third-Party Defendants, #11 Exhibit Exhibit D-086 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Nash Engineering Company's Notice of Intention to Pursue Cross-Claims and Third-Party Claims, #12 Exhibit Exhibit D-087 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Nash Engineering Company's Omnibus Response to Requests for Admission of Facts and Genuineness of Documents, #13 Exhibit Exhibit D-088 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Paramount Packing & Rubber, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-claims of All Co-defendan, #14 Exhibit Exhibit D-089 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Paramount Packing & Rubber, Inc.'s Answer to Short Form Complaint, #15 Exhibit Exhibit D-090 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Paramount Packing & Rubber, Inc.'s Cross-Claims, #16 Exhibit Exhibit D-091 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - SDDT Answer, #17 Exhibit Exhibit D-092 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - SDDT Crossclaim, #18 Exhibit Exhibit D-093 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - SDDT Interrogatories, #19 Exhibit Exhibit D-094 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - SDDT Requests for Production, #20 Exhibit Exhibit D-095 2018-11-28 Minor, Stephen - Lloyd E. Mitchell, Inc.'s Cross-Claims Against All Defendants and Third-Party Defendants (Minor), #21 Exhibit Exhibit D-096 2018-11-29 Minor, Stephen - Answer of Lloyd E. Mitchell, Inc. to Plaintiff's Complaint (Minor), #22 Exhibit Exhibit D-097 2018-11-29 Minor, Stephen - Lloyd E. Mitchell, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Claims of All Other Defendants (Minor), #23 Exhibit Exhibit D-098 2018-11-29 Minor, Stephen - Lloyd E. Mitchell, Inc.'s Cross-Claims Against All Defendants and Third-Party Defendants (Minor), #24 Exhibit Exhibit D-099 2018-11-29 Minor, Stephen - The Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust's Short Form Answer Case Affected Minor, #25 Exhibit Exhibit D-100 2018-11-30 Minor, Stephen - THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL)(Meringer, Donald)
February 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by General Electric Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, Exhibits D051-D075 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D-051 2018-11-16 Minor, Stephen - Short-Form Answer of Hampshire Industries, Inc., #2 Exhibit Exhibit D-052 2018-11-19 Minor, Stephen - Answer of Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (formerly known as Square D Company) to Any and All Deemed and Filed Cross-Claims and or Third-Party Complaints, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D-053 2018-11-19 Minor, Stephen - Answer of Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (formerly known as Square D Company) to Plaintiffs' Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-054 2018-11-19 Minor, Stephen - Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc.'s (formerly known as Square D Company) Notice of Intention to Pursue Cross-Claims, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D-055 2018-11-20 Minor, Stephen - Certainteed's Long Form Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand For Jury Trial, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D-056 2018-11-20 Minor, Stephen - SB Decking, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D-057 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on A.W. Chesterton Company, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D-058 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on Alfa Laval, Inc., #9 Exhibit Exhibit D-059 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on Certainteed Corporation, #10 Exhibit Exhibit D-060 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on Cooper Industries, #11 Exhibit Exhibit D-061 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on Crane Company, #12 Exhibit Exhibit D-062 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on E.L. Stebbings & Co., Inc., #13 Exhibit Exhibit D-063 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on General Electric Company, #14 Exhibit Exhibit D-064 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on Goulds Pumps (IPG), #15 Exhibit Exhibit D-065 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on Greene, Tweed & Co., #16 Exhibit Exhibit D-066 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on Hampshire Industries, Inc., #17 Exhibit Exhibit D-067 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on International Paper Co., #18 Exhibit Exhibit D-068 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on J. H. France Refractories Co., #19 Exhibit Exhibit D-069 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on John Crane-Houdaille, Inc., #20 Exhibit Exhibit D-070 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on Lloyd E. Mitchell, Inc., #21 Exhibit Exhibit D-071 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on MCIC, Inc., #22 Exhibit Exhibit D-072 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on Metropolitan Life, #23 Exhibit Exhibit D-073 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on Nash Engineering Company, #24 Exhibit Exhibit D-074 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on Paramount Packing & Rubber, Inc., #25 Exhibit Exhibit D-075 2018-11-26 Minor, Stephen - Affidavit of Service on Pecora Corporation)(Meringer, Donald)
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by General Electric Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, Exhibits D026-050 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D-026 2018-11-08 Minor, Stephen - Corning Inc., on behalf of its former Corhart Refractories business division's Short Form Answer, #2 Exhibit Exhibit D-027 2018-11-09 Minor, Stephen - General Electric Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D-028 2018-11-09 Minor, Stephen - Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Answer to the Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-029 2018-11-09 Minor, Stephen - Phelps Packing & Rubber Company, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D-030 2018-11-09 Minor, Stephen - Phelps Packing & Rubber Company, Inc.'s Answer to Crossclaims, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D-031 2018-11-09 Minor, Stephen - Phelps Packing & Rubber Company, Inc.'s Crossclaims, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D-032 2018-11-12 Minor, Stephen - International Paper Company's Cross Claim Against Defendants and Third Party Defendants, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D-033 2018-11-12 Minor, Stephen - International Paper Company's Notice of Intention to Pursue Cross Claims and Third Party Claims, #9 Exhibit Exhibit D-034 2018-11-12 Minor, Stephen - International Paper Company's Omnibus Response to Requests for Admission of Facts and Genuineness of Documents Propounded by any and All Parties, #10 Exhibit Exhibit D-035 2018-11-12 Minor, Stephen - MJG Entry of Appearance of Co-Counsel for Plaintiffs, #11 Exhibit Exhibit D-036 2018-11-13 Minor, Stephen - Cross-Claim of John Crane Inc., #12 Exhibit Exhibit D-037 2018-11-13 Minor, Stephen - Cross-Claims of Crane Co. Against All Other Defendants, #13 Exhibit Exhibit D-038 2018-11-13 Minor, Stephen - Plaintiff's Stipulation of Dismissal of IMO Industries only, #14 Exhibit Exhibit D-039 2018-11-14 Minor, Stephen - Answer of Defendant Crane Co. to Plaintiffs' Complaint, #15 Exhibit Exhibit D-040 2018-11-14 Minor, Stephen - Answer of Defendant Cross-Defendant Crane Co. to the Cross-Claims of All Other Defendants, #16 Exhibit Exhibit D-041 2018-11-14 Minor, Stephen - Cross-Claim of John Crane Inc., #17 Exhibit Exhibit D-042 2018-11-14 Minor, Stephen - Cross-Claims of Crane Co. Against All Other Defendants, #18 Exhibit Exhibit D-043 2018-11-14 Minor, Stephen - International Paper Company's Answer to Cross Claims, #19 Exhibit Exhibit D-044 2018-11-14 Minor, Stephen - International Paper Company's Cross Claim Against Defendants and Third Party Defendants, #20 Exhibit Exhibit D-045 2018-11-14 Minor, Stephen - International Paper Company's Notice of Intention to Pursue Cross Claims and Third Party Claims, #21 Exhibit Exhibit D-046 2018-11-14 Minor, Stephen - International Paper Company's Omnibus Response to Requests for Admission of Facts and Genuineness of Documents Propounded by any and All Parties, #22 Exhibit Exhibit D-047 2018-11-14 Minor, Stephen - International Paper Company's Short Form Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #23 Exhibit Exhibit D-048 2018-11-14 Minor, Stephen - John Crane Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #24 Exhibit Exhibit D-049 2018-11-14 Minor, Stephen - Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Ownes-Illinois, Inc. Only, #25 Exhibit Exhibit D-050 2018-11-16 Minor, Stephen - Letter from Hampshire Industries, Inc., stating objections to proposed scheduling order)(Meringer, Donald)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by General Electric Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, Exhibits D001-D025 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D-001 2018-10-12 Minor, Stephen - Civil - Non-Domestic Case Information Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit D-002 2018-10-12 Minor, Stephen - Request For Removal From Special Inactive Pretrial Docket., #3 Exhibit Exhibit D-003 2018-10-12 Minor, Stephen - Short Form Complaint And Demand For Jury Trial, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-004 2018-10-12 Minor, Stephen - Special Inactive Pretrial Docket Information Form, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D-005 2018-10-28 Minor, Stephen - Notice of Service of Discovery Materials With Summons and Complaints, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D-006 2018-10-28 Minor, Stephen - Plaintiffs' Certification of Attorney With Out-Of-State Office (Melanie J. Garner), #7 Exhibit Exhibit D-007 2018-10-31 Minor, Stephen - CBS Corporation's Answer to Cross Claims, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D-008 2018-10-31 Minor, Stephen - CBS Corporation's Cross Claim Against Defendants and Third Party Defendants, #9 Exhibit Exhibit D-009 2018-10-31 Minor, Stephen - CBS Corporation's Notice of Adoption of Witness Designations, #10 Exhibit Exhibit D-010 2018-10-31 Minor, Stephen - CBS Corporation's Notice of Intention to Pursue Cross Claims and Third Party Claims, #11 Exhibit Exhibit D-011 2018-10-31 Minor, Stephen - CBS Corporation's Omnibus Response to Requests for Admission of Facts and Genuineness of Documents Propounded by any and All Parties, #12 Exhibit Exhibit D-012 2018-10-31 Minor, Stephen - CBS Corporation's Short Form Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #13 Exhibit Exhibit D-013 2018-11-02 Minor, Stephen - Owens-Illinois, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #14 Exhibit Exhibit D-014 2018-11-02 Minor, Stephen - Owens-Illinois, Inc.'s Master Answer to All Cross and Third-Party Claims, #15 Exhibit Exhibit D-015 2018-11-02 Minor, Stephen - Owens-Illinois, Inc.'s Notice of Intention to Pursue Contribution and Allocation of Shares, #16 Exhibit Exhibit D-016 2018-11-05 Minor, Stephen - Owens-Illinois Line withdrawing their Answer to Complaint, Master Answer to All Cross Claims and Third-Party Claims and Notice of Intention to Pursue Contribution and Allocation of Shares, #17 Exhibit Exhibit D-017 2018-11-06 Minor, Stephen - IMO Industries Crossclaim, #18 Exhibit Exhibit D-018 2018-11-06 Minor, Stephen - IMO Interrogatories, #19 Exhibit Exhibit D-019 2018-11-06 Minor, Stephen - IMO Requests for Production, #20 Exhibit Exhibit D-020 2018-11-06 Minor, Stephen - Plaintiffs' Counsel's Notice of Change of Address, #21 Exhibit Exhibit D-021 2018-11-07 Minor, Stephen - Enter the Appearances of Michael T. Hamilton, Esquire and Rebekah S.W. Mears, Esquire as counsel for Defendant The Nash Engineering Company, #22 Exhibit Exhibit D-022 2018-11-07 Minor, Stephen - IMO Industries Answer, #23 Exhibit Exhibit D-023 2018-11-07 Minor, Stephen - IMO Industries Crossclaim, #24 Exhibit Exhibit D-024 2018-11-07 Minor, Stephen - IMO Interrogatories, #25 Exhibit Exhibit D-025 2018-11-07 Minor, Stephen - IMO Requests for Production)(Meringer, Donald)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by General Electric Company was filed incorrectly. **All state court documents must be individually attached and properly labeled with the name of the document, not as an exhibit. (Individual PDF documents, not combined). Please refile state court documents using the event "Notice-other" and link to #1 Notice of Removal. Please call the Clerk's Office with any questions pertaining to this filing prior to refiling. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.5 Certification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket Sheet)(Meringer, Donald)
February 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
February 17, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company (Meringer, Donald)
February 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24X18000254. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8517071), filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Email from S. Nolan, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts from 01-24-2020 Doc. Production, #4 Exhibit D001-053, #5 Exhibit D054-085, #6 Exhibit D086-105, #7 Exhibit D106-210, #8 Exhibit D211-314, #9 Exhibit E - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Meringer, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minor et al v. Union Carbide Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen P Minor
Represented By: Stephen J Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen L. Minor
Represented By: Stephen J Nolan
Represented By: Melanie Joustra Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen P. Minor
Represented By: Stephen J Nolan
Represented By: Melanie Joustra Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Donald S Meringer
Represented By: Glenn A Gordon
Represented By: Michael L Haslup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: David J Quigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Refractories Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koppers Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB Decking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Matthew R Schroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phelps Packing and Rubber Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane-Houdaille, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pecora Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.H. France Refractories Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.L. Stebbings & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air and Liquid Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Demag Delaval Turbomachinery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Packing & Rubber, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazer East, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cope-Vulcan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd E. Mitchell, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Refractories Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hampshire Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corning Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown, Cork and Seal Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps (IPG) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owen-Illinois Glass Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nash Engineering Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCIC, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Clare Marie Maisano
Represented By: Philip A Kulinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?