Vigilant Solutions, LLC v. Rekor Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vigilant Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Rekor Recognition Systems, Inc., Rekor Systems, Inc. and OpenALPR Software Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00465
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vigilant Solutions, LLC. Rekor Systems, Inc. served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020.(Bergin, John)
March 24, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vigilant Solutions, LLC. Rekor Recognition Systems, Inc. served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020.(Bergin, John)
March 24, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vigilant Solutions, LLC. OpenALPR Software Solutions, LLC served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020.(Bergin, John)
March 13, 2020 Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Timothy E Taylor. Directing attorney Timothy E Taylor to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/13/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2020 Filing 11 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Timothy E. Taylor by Vigilant Solutions, LLC. The fee has already been paid.(Bergin, John)
March 12, 2020 Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Steven D Moore. Directing attorney Steven D Moore to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 3/12/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2020 Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joshua H Lee. Directing attorney Joshua H Lee to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/12/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Vigilant Solutions, LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
March 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Steven D. Moore (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8565220.) by Vigilant Solutions, LLC(Bergin, John)
March 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joshua H. Lee (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8565198.) by Vigilant Solutions, LLC(Bergin, John)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Timothy E. Taylor (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8565169.) by Vigilant Solutions, LLC(Bergin, John)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to OpenALPR Software Solutions, LLC, Rekor Recognition Systems, Inc., Rekor Systems, Inc..(kos, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Vigilant Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Motorola Solutions, Inc., Corporate Parent Vaas International Holdings, Inc. for Vigilant Solutions, LLC.(Bergin, John)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark re #1 Complaint,, filed by Vigilant Solutions, LLC (Bergin, John)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against OpenALPR Software Solutions, LLC, Rekor Recognition Systems, Inc., Rekor Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8528635.), filed by Vigilant Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 8781169, #3 Summons Summons in a Civil Action (Rekor Systems), #4 Summons Summons in a Civil Action (Rekor Recognition, #5 Summons Summons in a Civil Action (OpenALPR))(Bergin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vigilant Solutions, LLC v. Rekor Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rekor Recognition Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rekor Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenALPR Software Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vigilant Solutions, LLC
Represented By: John Timothy Bergin
Represented By: Timothy E Taylor
Represented By: Steven D Moore
Represented By: Joshua Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?