Pandora Jewelry, LLC v. Unique Sales Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Pandora Jewelry, LLC
Defendant: Boruch B. Duchman, Unique Sales Corp., Yonit J. Duchman and John Does, 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv00615
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pandora Jewelry, LLC. Boruch B. Duchman served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020; Yonit J. Duchman served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020; Unique Sales Corp. served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Blumenfeld, Michael)
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 QC NOTICE: #9 Affidavit of Service filed by Pandora Jewelry, LLC was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file using the event "Summons Returned Executed" found in the civil events category of Initial Pleadings and Service - Service of Process. Enter the service date when prompted so the answer deadline can be set in CM/ECF. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Unique Sales Corp., Boruch Duchman and Yonit Duchman on 04/17/2020, filed by Pandora Jewelry, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Blumenfeld, Michael) Modified on 4/22/2020 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Alternative Service. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 4/17/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Alternative Service by Pandora Jewelry, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Martha Motley, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld, Michael)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Pandora Jewelry, LLC as to Yonit J. Duchman.(Blumenfeld, Michael)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Pandora Jewelry, LLC as to Boruch B. Duchman.(Blumenfeld, Michael)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Pandora Jewelry, LLC as to Unique Sales Corp..(Blumenfeld, Michael)
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Boruch B. Duchman, Yonit J. Duchman, Unique Sales Corp.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Pandora Jewelry, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Pandora A/S, Other Affiliate Pandora Jewelry, Inc. for Pandora Jewelry, LLC.(Blumenfeld, Michael)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8555021.), filed by Pandora Jewelry, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Blumenfeld, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pandora Jewelry, LLC v. Unique Sales Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boruch B. Duchman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unique Sales Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yonit J. Duchman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does, 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pandora Jewelry, LLC
Represented By: Michael Evan Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?