Harris Research, Inc. v. Palmieri
Plaintiff: Harris Research, Inc.
Defendant: Gary Palmieri
Case Number: 1:2020cv00733
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harris Research, Inc.. Gary Palmieri served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020.(KUSHNER, KYLE)
March 24, 2020 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Harris Research, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent HRI Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent BELFOR (USA) Group, Inc., Corporate Parent BELFOR Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent ASP BF Intermediate Sub, LLC, Other Affiliate Devere International, Inc., Other Affiliate Delta Disaster Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Delta Development Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Delta Asset Management, LLC, Other Affiliate NHance, Inc., Other Affiliate BHI Distribution, LLC, Other Affiliate BELFOR (Canada), Inc., Other Affiliate Winmar (Canada) International Ltd, Other Affiliate 1-800-Water Damage North America Canada, Inc., Other Affiliate 1-800 Water Damage Canada, Inc., Other Affiliate DUCTZ Canada, Inc., Other Affiliate HOODZ Canada, Inc., Other Affiliate BELFOR Franchise Group, LLC, Other Affiliate HOODZ International, LLC, Other Affiliate HOODZ North America, LLC, Other Affiliate DUCTZ International, LLC, Other Affiliate DUCTZ North America, LLC, Other Affiliate DUCTZ-NST Ventures, LLC, Other Affiliate 1-800 WATER DAMAGE International, LLC, Other Affiliate 1-800 WATER DAMAGE North America, LLC, Other Affiliate A Cure Disaster Services, LLC, Other Affiliate DRIPLOC, LLC, Other Affiliate PLUMBERZ International, LLC, Other Affiliate PLUMBERZ North America, LL, Other Affiliate PACKOUTZ North America, LLC for Harris Research, Inc..(KUSHNER, KYLE)
March 23, 2020 Filing 8 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Edwards, James)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 QC NOTICE: #6 Notice (Other) filed by Harris Research, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event selected. Please refile using the event under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by Harris Research, Inc. re PTO Notice (Edwards, James) Modified on 3/23/2020 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Gary Palmieri. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
March 19, 2020 Deficiency Notice for Harris Research, Inc.-- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 3/26/2020 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
March 19, 2020 Deficiency Notice for Harris Research, Inc.-- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 3/26/2020 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 3/19/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Harris Research, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Proposed Summons to Gary Palmieri (KUSHNER, KYLE)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Harris Research, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(KUSHNER, KYLE)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harris Research, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8576721.), filed by Harris Research, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(KUSHNER, KYLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris Research, Inc. v. Palmieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Palmieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harris Research, Inc.
Represented By: KYLE S KUSHNER
Represented By: James E Edwards, Jr
Represented By: Christopher C Dahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?