Krus v. Krus
Plaintiff: Carol Ann Krus
Defendant: Dennis Krus
Case Number: 1:2020cv00740
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for Settlement. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 4/27/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #13 Joint Correspondence re: Preliminary Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 4/27/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 20, 2020 Filing 13 Joint Correspondence re: Preliminary Scheduling Order (Deviney, Stephanie)
April 16, 2020 Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stephanie Nolan Deviney. Directing attorney Stephanie Nolan Deviney to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
April 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephanie Nolan Deviney (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8611618.) by Carol Ann Krus(Morgan, Sharon)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 8/26/2020.Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 4/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Scheduling Order, #2 Standing Order on Discovery Procedures)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Dennis Krus.(Anias, Valerie)
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carol Ann Krus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morgan, Sharon)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dennis Krus, filed by Carol Ann Krus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Attachment redlined version of Complaint)(Morgan, Sharon)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to Dennis Krus.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: #4 Amended Complaint filed by Carol Ann Krus needs to be corrected. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. The following corrective actions are needed regarding missing or incomplete information: **Redline copy has not been filed. Please re-file the clean version of the amended complaint as the main document and the redline version as an attachment to the amended complaint. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 (FILED IN ERROR) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dennis Krus, filed by Carol Ann Krus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morgan, Sharon) Modified on 3/23/2020 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Carol Ann Krus re #1 Complaint (Summons) (Morgan, Sharon)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Carol Ann Krus was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 Complaint. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dennis Krus ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8577760.), filed by Carol Ann Krus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morgan, Sharon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krus v. Krus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Krus
Represented By: Valerie Elizabeth Anias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Ann Krus
Represented By: Sharon Oras Morgan
Represented By: Stephanie Nolan Deviney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?