Billingsly et al v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Billingsly, Jeremy Clifford, Mike Robbins, Bryan Sutz, Jason Billingsly and Kyle Wood
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00858
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 THIS IS A CONSOLIDATED CASE. PLEASE DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE OR SPREAD TEXT IN THIS CASE. ALL SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS ARE TO BE ELECTRONICALLY FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE (18-744). (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 5, 2020 Cases associated: Create association to 1:18-cv-00744-JKB. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/4/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 4, 2020 Filing 40 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiavetta, Thomas)
April 6, 2020 Filing 39 Correspondence to counsel re: transfer notification letter (c/m 4/6/2020) (krs, Deputy Clerk)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Paperless ORDER Granting #37 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 4/6/2020. Modified on 4/6/2020 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
April 6, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Local Counsel- Audrey H. Schechter by Jason Billingsley, Jason Billingsly(Thompson, Nicholas)
April 1, 2020 Filing 36 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-00858. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING #18 Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue. This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 3/26/2020. (AMP)
March 23, 2020 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Chiavetta, Thomas)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ENDORSED ORDER granting #32 Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Stay. Defendant shall have up to and including March 23, 2020 to file a reply, which shall not exceed four pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 3/16/2020. (RLS)
March 13, 2020 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Stay by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Chiavetta, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified text on 3/16/2020. (AEJ)
March 10, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jason Billingsly, Jeremy Clifford, Mike Robbins, Bryan Stutz, Kyle Wood. (Thompson, Nicholas)
February 25, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits in Support of Motion to Stay Pending Arbitration, #2 Exhibit in Support of Motion to Stay Pending Arbitration)(Chiavetta, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ENDORSED ORDER granting #26 Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order. Discovery related to Plaintiffs' claims concerning the lawfulness of Defendant's attendance policy is stayed until the Court has ruled on #18 Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 2/24/2020. (RLS)
February 21, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #26 MOTION for protective order filed by Jason Billingsly. (Thompson, Nicholas)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER directing Plaintiff to respond to #26 Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order on or before February 21, 2020. If no response is received, the Motion will be considered unopposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 2/14/2020. (RLS)
January 29, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for protective order by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Chiavetta, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified on 1/30/2020 to edit text (PAM).
November 15, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #23 Case management and scheduling order by CSX Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CSX Corporation for CSX Transportation, Inc... (Kynes, Cameron)
November 13, 2019 Filing 24 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (AEJ)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/4/2020; Dispositive motions due by 10/1/2020; Conduct mediation hearing by 1/15/2021; Pretrial statement due by 2/10/2021; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 3/1/2021 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Docket Sheets)(AMP)
November 5, 2019 Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Chiavetta, Thomas)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING #20 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Filing Case Management Report. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 10/22/2019. (AMP)
September 20, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Chiavetta, Thomas)
September 3, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to transfer case filed by Jason Billingsly, Jeremy Clifford, Mike Robbins, Bryan Stutz, Kyle Wood. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Nicholas Thompson)(Thompson, Nicholas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to transfer case by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit Chiavetta Decl., #3 Exhibit Chiavetta Decl. Ex. 1, #4 Exhibit Chiavetta Decl. Ex. 2, #5 Exhibit Chiavetta Decl. Ex. 3, #6 Exhibit Chiavetta Decl. Ex. 4, #7 Exhibit Chiavetta Decl. Ex. 5, #8 Exhibit Kuhner Decl.)(Chiavetta, Thomas)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 and #14 Defendant's Unopposed Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice and Designation and Consent to Act Pursuant to Local Rule 2.02. If Thomas R. Chiavetta, Jr., Esq. and Donald D. Munro, Esq., have not already done so, they shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 8/16/2019. (RLS)
August 15, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Thomas R. Chiavetta, appearing on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX031473.) Related document: #13 Unopposed MOTION for Thomas R. Chiavetta, Jr. to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
August 15, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Donald J. Munro, appearing on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX031472.) Related document: #14 Unopposed MOTION for Donald J. Munro to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by CSX Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CSX Corporation for CSX Transportation, Inc... (Kynes, Cameron)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by CSX Transportation, Inc..(Kynes, Cameron)
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Donald J. Munro to appear pro hac vice by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Kynes, Cameron) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Thomas R. Chiavetta, Jr. to appear pro hac vice by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Kynes, Cameron) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Thomas R. Chiavetta, Jr. to appear pro hac vice by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Kynes, Cameron) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified on 8/16/2019 - removed PDF and terminated Motion, attorney duplicated event in error. (AEJ)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 Written designation and consent to act by Nicholas Delton Thompson on behalf of Jason Billingsly, Jeremy Clifford, Mike Robbins, Bryan Stutz, Kyle Wood. Local Counsel: Audrey Hildes Schechter. Non-Resident Counsel: Nicholas D. Thompson. (Thompson, Nicholas)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Nicholas D. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. If Nicholas D. Thompson, Esq., has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 8/12/2019. (RLS)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED MOTION for Nicholas D. Thompson to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Certification)(Schechter, Audrey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified on 8/9/2019 to edit text (PAM).
August 5, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Nicholas D. Thompson, appearing on behalf of Jason Billingsly, Jeremy Clifford, Mike Robbins, Bryan Stutz, Kyle Wood (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX031398.) Related document: #7 MOTION for Nicholas D. Thompson to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Plaintiff's Motion for Nicholas D. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 8/5/2019. (RLS)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Nicholas D. Thompson to appear pro hac vice by Jason Billingsly, Jeremy Clifford, Mike Robbins, Bryan Stutz, Kyle Wood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Certification)(Schechter, Audrey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF of service by Jason Billingsly, Jeremy Clifford, Mike Robbins, Bryan Stutz, Kyle Wood (Schechter, Audrey)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to CSX Transportation, Inc. (AEJ)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel, Nicholas D. Thompson, of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (AEJ)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:19-cv-858-J-39JBT. (SJB)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Billingsly, et al. against CSX Transportation, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15719934) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Schechter, Audrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Billingsly et al v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billingsly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Clifford
Represented By: Nicholas D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Robbins
Represented By: Nicholas D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Sutz
Represented By: Nicholas D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Billingsly
Represented By: Nicholas D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Wood
Represented By: Nicholas D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas R Chiavetta
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?