Mack v. Anderson Trucking Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Mack
Defendant: Anderson Trucking Service, Inc., Garland Slack and Sunbelt Furniture Xpress, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01046
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re: Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 5/28/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman for Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/28/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Marginal ORDER Approving #13 Status Report filed by Sunbelt Furniture Xpress, Inc., Anderson Trucking Service, Inc., Garland Slack. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/28/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 27, 2020 Filing 13 Status Report Submitted Initial Joint Status Report by Anderson Trucking Service, Inc., Garland Slack, Sunbelt Furniture Xpress, Inc. (Goorevitz, Tamara)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 9/25/2020. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Letter) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENT (11) IS A COPY OF THE ORIGINAL PAPER FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 12, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Anderson Trucking Service, Inc., Garland Slack, Sunbelt Furniture Xpress, Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 12, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.5 Certificate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Goorevitz, Tamara)
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #8 Standing Order Concerning Removal Statement Concerning Removal filed by Anderson Trucking Service, Inc., Garland Slack, Sunbelt Furniture Xpress, Inc..(Goorevitz, Tamara)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 4/23/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Anderson Trucking Service, Inc., Garland Slack, Sunbelt Furniture Xpress, Inc. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3-6) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 Jury Trial Demand by Kevin Mack(dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of filing of state court discovery material by Anderson Trucking Service, Inc., Garland Slack, Sunbelt Furniture Xpress, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Interrogatories 1, #2 Interrogatories 2)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued 60 days as to Anderson Trucking Service, Inc., Garland Slack, Sunbelt Furniture Xpress, Inc. (Attachments: #1 summons 2, #2 summons 3)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Anderson Trucking Service, Inc., Garland Slack, Sunbelt Furniture Xpress, Inc., filed by Kevin Mack.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sunbelt Furniture Xpress, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Anderson Trucking Service, Inc. for Sunbelt Furniture Xpress, Inc..(Goorevitz, Tamara)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore County, case number C-03-CV-20-001191. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8622542), filed by Sunbelt Furniture Xpress, Inc., Anderson Trucking Service, Inc., Garland Slack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons to Slack, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons to Sunbelt, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons to ATS, #4 Exhibit 4 - Case Information Report, #5 Exhibit 5 - Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 - Jury Demand, #7 Exhibit 7 - Interrogatories to Slack, #8 Exhibit 8 - Interrogatories to ATS & Sunbelt, #9 Exhibit 9 - Requests for Production to Defendants, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Exhibit Certificate re Filing Removal in State Court)(Goorevitz, Tamara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mack v. Anderson Trucking Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson Trucking Service, Inc.
Represented By: Tamara B Goorevitz
Represented By: David A Skomba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garland Slack
Represented By: Tamara B Goorevitz
Represented By: David A Skomba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbelt Furniture Xpress, Inc.
Represented By: Tamara B Goorevitz
Represented By: David A Skomba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Mack
Represented By: Lauren Monica Geisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?