Bergmann, Trustee et al v. The Smithsonian Institution et al
Plaintiff: Carl B. Prigg, Minette McCullough Blandon, Trustee, Kiersten McGreer, Helena C. Travers, William T. Cook, George Blake, Trustee, Everett A. Bergmann, Tiffany Martin, Ferdinand H. Bergmann, Carl K. Bergmann, William Paul Brandon Frazier, Judy Lane, Timothy Taylor Prigg, Trustee, June O. Laubscher, Minette Ann McCullough, Carl K. Bergmann, Trustee, Joseph Timothy Cook, Trustee, Joseph P. Cook, Kyra Cook, Minette Prigg McCullough, Trustee, George Pearson Bergmann, George Riggin, Trustee, Charles William McCullough, Trustee, Lucy A. Bergmann, James R. Bergmann, Trustee, Harry P. Bergmann, Everett A. Bergmann, Trustee, Jr., Louise W. Bergmann, Lawrence E. Laubscher, Trustee, William B. Prigg, Jr., Lawrence E. Laubscher, Trustee, Jr., EAB Cottage LLC, Carol McGreer, William F. Bergmann and Amanda Prigg Bolgiano, Trustee
Defendant: The Smithsonian Institution and Anne Arundel County, Maryland
Case Number: 1:2020cv01080
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:240
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 17 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Smithsonian Institution (Andersen, Jane)
September 23, 2020 Deficiency Notice as to The Smithsonian Institution -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 9/30/2020 (bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by The Smithsonian Institution.(Andersen, Jane)
September 9, 2020 Zoom Settlement Conference held on 9/9/2020 before Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MARGINAL ORDER Granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer The Smithsonian Institution answer due 9/23/2020.. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/31/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 28, 2020 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by The Smithsonian Institution(Andersen, Jane)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 8/4/2020. (daws, Chambers)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimand/or for Summary Judgment filed by Anne Arundel County, Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B (Affidavit of Pamela Groves))(Creech, Jay)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for Settlement. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/31/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #9 Settlement Conference - requesting filed by The Smithsonian Institution. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/29/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 Settlement Conference - requesting (Andersen, Jane)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/24/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Response in Opposition to Motion,, by Anne Arundel County, Maryland (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Creech, Jay)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimand/or for Summary Judgment filed by Carl K. Bergmann, Everett A. Bergmann, Ferdinand H. Bergmann, George Pearson Bergmann, Harry P. Bergmann, Louise W. Bergmann, Lucy A. Bergmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Deed to Richard Contee, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2- Deed to MD Steamboat, #3 Exhibit Deed to Tolchester Beach, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Deed to Kirkpatrick Howat, #5 Exhibit Plat with County Road, #6 Exhibit Deed to Bergmann, #7 Exhibit Transfer in Trust, #8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tracy, Kevin)
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimand/or for Summary Judgment by Anne Arundel County, Maryland (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A (Affidavit of Blake Lightcap), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Creech, Jay)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane Elizabeth Andersen on behalf of The Smithsonian Institution (Andersen, Jane)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by EAB Cottage LLC (Tracy, Kevin)
April 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Anne Arundel County, Maryland, The Smithsonian Institution. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 28, 2020 Deficiency Notice as to EAB Cottage LLC -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 5/5/2020 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8628635.), filed by EAB Cottage LLC, Tiffany Martin, William T. Cook, Harry P. Bergmann, Carl K. Bergmann, James R. Bergmann, Trustee, Louise W. Bergmann, Everett A. Bergmann, Joseph Timothy Cook, Trustee, Carl K. Bergmann, Trustee, Carl B. Prigg, Minette Prigg McCullough, Trustee, George Blake, Trustee, George Pearson Bergmann, Kyra Cook, Lawrence E. Laubscher, Trustee, Lucy A. Bergmann, Minette Ann McCullough, Charles William McCullough, Trustee, Amanda Prigg Bolgiano, Trustee, Helena C. Travers, Joseph P. Cook, Everett A. Bergmann, Trustee, Jr, William F. Bergmann, June O. Laubscher, Timothy Taylor Prigg, Trustee, William Paul Brandon Frazier, William B. Prigg, Jr, Ferdinand H. Bergmann, Carol McGreer, Minette McCullough Blandon, Trustee, Kiersten McGreer, George Riggin, Trustee, Judy Lane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons to The Smithsonian Institute, #5 Summons to Anne Arundel County, Maryland)(Tracy, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bergmann, Trustee et al v. The Smithsonian Institution et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl B. Prigg
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minette McCullough Blandon, Trustee
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiersten McGreer
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helena C. Travers
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William T. Cook
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Blake, Trustee
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everett A. Bergmann
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Martin
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferdinand H. Bergmann
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl K. Bergmann
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Paul Brandon Frazier
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Lane
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Taylor Prigg, Trustee
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June O. Laubscher
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minette Ann McCullough
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl K. Bergmann, Trustee
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Timothy Cook, Trustee
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph P. Cook
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyra Cook
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minette Prigg McCullough, Trustee
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Pearson Bergmann
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Riggin, Trustee
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles William McCullough, Trustee
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy A. Bergmann
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Bergmann, Trustee
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry P. Bergmann
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everett A. Bergmann, Trustee, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise W. Bergmann
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence E. Laubscher, Trustee
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William B. Prigg, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence E. Laubscher, Trustee, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EAB Cottage LLC
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol McGreer
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William F. Bergmann
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Prigg Bolgiano, Trustee
Represented By: Kevin M Tracy
Represented By: Gregory R Hislop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Smithsonian Institution
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Arundel County, Maryland
Represented By: Jay H Creech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?