Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc. v. Cold Bottom Farms, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc. and Crop Production Services, Inc.
Defendant: Cold Bottom Farms, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01276
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #13 Stipulation filed by Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/13/2020. (vals, Chambers)
July 13, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc.(Strickland, Bradley)
July 13, 2020 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT by Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc.(Strickland, Bradley)
July 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John Brooks Leahy on behalf of Cold Bottom Farms, Inc. (Leahy, John)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re: Default. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/29/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc.. Cold Bottom Farms, Inc. served on 6/4/2020, answer due 6/25/2020.(Andrews, Philip)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #7 Summons Returned Executed filed by Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Please refile summons returned executed and select the defendant as the party being served. It has been marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 (FILED IN ERROR) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc.. Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc. served on 6/4/2020, answer due 6/25/2020.(Andrews, Philip) Modified on 6/10/2020 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 QC NOTICE: #5 Affidavit of Service, filed by Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc. was filed using the incorrect event. **Please refile affidavit under the "Service of Process" category, select the "Summons Returned Executed" event, and enter the service date when requested. The affidavit has been marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summonses, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibits, Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure of Corporate Interest, Notice of Entry of Appearance served on Charles E. Ensor on behalf of Cold Bottom Farms, Inc. on June 4, 2020, filed by Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc..(Andrews, Philip) Modified on 6/9/2020 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
May 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Mills Strickland on behalf of Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc. (Strickland, Bradley)
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Cold Bottom Farms, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nutrien Ltd. for Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc..(Andrews, Philip)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cold Bottom Farms, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8663010.), filed by Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #4 Summons Cold Bottom Farms, Inc., #5 Summons Cold Bottom Farms, Inc., #6 Summons Cold Bottom Farms, Inc.)(Andrews, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc. v. Cold Bottom Farms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cold Bottom Farms, Inc.
Represented By: John Brooks Leahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Philip M Andrews
Represented By: Bradley Mills Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crop Production Services, Inc.
Represented By: Philip M Andrews
Represented By: Bradley Mills Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?