Green v. Green-Samp
Plaintiff: Marisa Green
Defendant: Gina Green-Samp
Case Number: 1:2020cv01330
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Gina Green-Samp. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 7/21/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 20, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gina Green-Samp (Savage, Atarah)
June 11, 2020 Filing 13 -[FILED IN ERROR]- NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #12 Consent to Magistrate Judge. Gina Green-SampGina Green-Samp must correct the following error(s):**Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (bas, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 6/11/2020 (bas, Deputy Clerk).
June 8, 2020 Filing 12 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Savage, Atarah)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 10/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 6/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling Order, #2 Standing Memorandum to Counsel Concerning Discovery) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2020 Filing 10 QC NOTICE: 9 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Gina Green-Samp was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event selected. Please refile using the event under Correspondence > Magistrate Judge-Consent to. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Parties to Submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re #7 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/5/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite for all Proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/5/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Gina Green-Samp. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure)(Savage, Atarah)
June 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Gina Green-Samp re #3 Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal, 2 QC Notice - Miscellaneous, Remark - State Court Docs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Savage, Atarah)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/29/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 29, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Gina Green-Samp, filed by Marisa Green.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Gina Green-Samp was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Civil Cover Sheet. To correct this problem, file Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link Civil Cover Sheet to #1 Notice of Removal. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-20-001967., filed by Gina Green-Samp. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Certificate of Filing Notice of Removal)(Savage, Atarah) Modified on 5/29/2020 (krs, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Green-Samp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Green-Samp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisa Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?