Collins Elevator Service Inc. v. Walsh Federal, LLC
Plaintiff: Collins Elevator Service Inc.
Defendant: WALSH FEDERAL, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01387
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 10/15/2020. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 6/16/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 16, 2020 Telephone Conference re: Scheduling held on 6/16/2020 before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (kams, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 6/29/2020 (cags, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 6/29/2020 (kams, Deputy Clerk).
June 7, 2020 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Collins Elevator Service Inc., Collins Elevator Service Inc. (Spence, Donald)
June 7, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Walsh Federal by Collins Elevator Service Inc..(Spence, Donald)
June 3, 2020 Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 6/10/2020 (krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 MISCELLANEOUS Correspondence to counsel advising of a conference call to discuss the attached proposed scheduling order. Counsel are requested to confirm with Chambers their participation. (Blake, Catherine)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR ANNE ARUNDEL COUNTY. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Walsh Federal, LLC, filed by Collins Elevator Service Inc..(krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by WALSH FEDERAL, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Walsh Construction Group LLC, Other Affiliate Matthew M. Walsh Trust, Other Affiliate Daniel J. Walsh Trust for WALSH FEDERAL, LLC.(Pierce, Michael)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Collins Elevator Service Inc. by WALSH FEDERAL, LLC.(Pierce, Michael)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County, case number C-02-CV-20-001130. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8678951), filed by WALSH FEDERAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Ct. Summons, #2 Exhibit State Ct. Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Ct. Sched. Order, #4 Exhibit State Ct. Mediation Order, #5 Exhibit State Ct. Case Info. Report, #6 Exhibit State Ct. Letter re: Mediation, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Pierce, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins Elevator Service Inc. v. Walsh Federal, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collins Elevator Service Inc.
Represented By: Donald H Spence, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALSH FEDERAL, LLC
Represented By: Michael Joseph Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?