Philips North America LLC v. Hayes
Plaintiff: Philips North America LLC
Defendant: Steven Hayes
Case Number: 1:2020cv01409
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Steven Hayes.(Goldstein, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2020 Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Katharine Lennox. Directing attorney Katharine Lennox to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/22/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael Ross Phillips. Directing attorney Michael Ross Phillips to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 7/22/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Philips North America LLC.(Simons, Adam)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Katharine P. Lennox (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8757853.) by Philips North America LLC(Simons, Adam)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael R. Phillips (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8757826.) by Philips North America LLC(Simons, Adam)
July 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Steven Hayes (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum)(Goldstein, Jeffrey)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Steven Hayes answer due 7/3/2020.. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/25/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Steven Hayes(Goldstein, Jeffrey)
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philips North America LLC. Steven Hayes served on 6/4/2020, answer due 6/25/2020.(Simons, Adam)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Steven Hayes.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Philips North America LLC identifying Corporate Parent Royal Philips, N.V., Other Affiliate Philips Holding USA, Inc., Other Affiliate Philips North America, LLC for Philips North America LLC.(Simons, Adam)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steven Hayes ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8680249.), filed by Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Summons)(Simons, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philips North America LLC v. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips North America LLC
Represented By: Adam T Simons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?