Pasadena Boat Works, LLC v. Carolina Skiff,LLC
Plaintiff: Pasadena Boat Works, LLC
Defendant: Carolina Skiff,LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01414
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #25 Motion for the Court to adopt previously submitted response in opposition. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/23/2020. (vdcs, Chambers)
July 22, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION To Adopt Previously Filed Opposition to Carolina Skiff's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Pasadena Boat Works, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Biscoe-Hall, Mary)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying as moot #9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Vacating the existing scheduling conference set for 07/24/2020. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/9/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2020 Filing 23 Motion to Dismiss filed by Carolina Skiff,LLC.(Yanacek, Meghan) Modified on 7/10/2020 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
July 8, 2020 Filing 22 Correspondence re: Proposed Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(vdcs, Chambers)
July 8, 2020 Filing 21 Defendant's ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Pasadena Boat Works, LLC by Carolina Skiff,LLC.(Yanacek, Meghan)
July 6, 2020 Filing 20 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Carolina Skiff,LLC (Yanacek, Meghan)
July 1, 2020 Filing 19 AMENDED ANSWER to, COUNTERCLAIM against Pasadena Boat Works, LLC by Carolina Skiff,LLC. (Yanacek, Meghan)
July 1, 2020 Deficiency Notice for Carolina Skiff,LLC -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 7/8/2020 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2020 Filing 18 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Pasadena Boat Works, LLC (Sturtz, Matthew)
July 1, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Pasadena Boat Works, LLC.(Sturtz, Matthew)
June 24, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Pasadena Boat Works, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Sturtz, Matthew)
June 24, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Carolina Skiff,LLC, filed by Pasadena Boat Works, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Redlined version of First Amended Complaint)(Sturtz, Matthew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Carolina Skiff,LLC re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim PROPOSED ORDER (Yanacek, Meghan)
June 10, 2020 Filing 13 Proposed MOTION to Dismiss Proposed Order by Carolina Skiff,LLC(Yanacek, Meghan)
June 10, 2020 Filing 12 Request for Hearing (Yanacek, Meghan)
June 10, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #2 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Pasadena Boat Works, LLC by Carolina Skiff,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit to Counterclaim)(Yanacek, Meghan)
June 10, 2020 Filing 10 Memorandum re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Carolina Skiff,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Memorandum In Support of Motion To Dismiss Complaint)(Yanacek, Meghan)
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Carolina Skiff,LLC(Yanacek, Meghan)
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Carolina Skiff,LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing of Civil Information Sheet (Attachments: #1 Attachment Ex. 1 - Civil Information Sheet)(Yanacek, Meghan)
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Carolina Skiff,LLC was filed incorrectly. When filing a Notice of Removal all attachments must be labeled and filed as separate attachments - Example: Complaint, Summons etc. No Civil Cover Sheet Filed and Attachment 2 Return of Service was filed upside down. Please note the changes have been made for you except the civil cover sheet. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 6/4/2020. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2020 The above documents #2 through 5 are copies of filing in the Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County, Maryland. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Carolina Skiff,LLC (slss, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pasadena Boat Works, LLC. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued 60 days as to Carolina Skiff,LLC.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Carolina Skiff,LLC, filed by Pasadena Boat Works, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Lower Court Civil Cover Sheet)(slss, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County, case number C-02-CV-20-001091. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8680495), filed by Carolina Skiff,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1- State Court Action Complaint and Summonss, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Correspondence from Maryland SDAT re Service of Process, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Yanacek, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pasadena Boat Works, LLC v. Carolina Skiff,LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolina Skiff,LLC
Represented By: Meghan Renee Hatfield Yanacek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pasadena Boat Works, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Scott Sturtz
Represented By: Mary C Biscoe-Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?