EMTA Insaat Taahhut ve Ticaret A.S. v. Cosmopolitan Incorporated
Plaintiff: EMTA Insaat Taahhut ve Ticaret A.S.
Defendant: Cosmopolitan Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2020cv01457
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 7/30/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite for Settlement. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/30/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 11/27/2020. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Memorandum to Counsel Concerning Discovery)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 29, 2020 Filing 20 Status Report Submitted Jointly by all Parties by Cosmopolitan Incorporated (Rodgers-Waire, Cynthia)
July 28, 2020 Filing 19 Counter Defendant EMTA's ANSWER to #15 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by EMTA Insaat Taahhut ve Ticaret A.S..(Busch, Alexandra)
July 21, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Motion to Dismiss Count III of Complaint by EMTA Insaat Taahhut ve Ticaret A.S.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of EMTA's Opposition to Cosmopolitan's Motion to Dismiss Count III of Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order denying Cosmopolitan's Motion to Dismiss Count III of Complaint)(Busch, Alexandra)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM to Counsel re: Draft Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/8/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 7, 2020 Filing 16 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Cosmopolitan Incorporated (Rodgers-Waire, Cynthia)
July 7, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, (Counts 1 and II), Motion to Dismiss Count III of Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against EMTA Insaat Taahhut ve Ticaret A.S. by Cosmopolitan Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rodgers-Waire, Cynthia)
July 1, 2020 Filing 14 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by EMTA Insaat Taahhut ve Ticaret A.S. (Busch, Alexandra)
June 18, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMTA Insaat Taahhut ve Ticaret A.S.. Cosmopolitan Incorporated served on 6/16/2020, answer due 7/7/2020.(Busch, Alexandra)
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Delal Deniz Harrison. Directing attorney Delal Deniz Harrison to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/16/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John H Perten. Directing attorney John H Perten to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/16/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Delal Deniz Harrison by EMTA Insaat Taahhut ve Ticaret A.S.. The fee has already been paid.(Busch, Alexandra)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 Second CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John H. Perten by EMTA Insaat Taahhut ve Ticaret A.S.. The fee has already been paid.(Busch, Alexandra)
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #5 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by EMTA Insaat Taahhut ve Ticaret A.S. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 QC NOTICE: #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by EMTA Insaat Taahhut ve Ticaret A.S. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 QC NOTICE: #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by EMTA Insaat Taahhut ve Ticaret A.S. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John H. Perten by EMTA Insaat Taahhut ve Ticaret A.S.. The fee has already been paid.(Busch, Alexandra)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Cosmopolitan Incorporated.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John H. Perten (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8681955.) by EMTA Insaat Taahhut ve Ticaret A.S.(Busch, Alexandra)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Delal Deniz Harrison (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8681946.) by EMTA Insaat Taahhut ve Ticaret A.S.(Busch, Alexandra)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract, Specific Performance, and Prompt Pay Act Violation against Cosmopolitan Incorporated ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8681931.), filed by EMTA Insaat Taahhut ve Ticaret A.S.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A: Subcontract, #3 Exhibit Ex. B: Demand Letter, #4 Summons)(Busch, Alexandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMTA Insaat Taahhut ve Ticaret A.S. v. Cosmopolitan Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMTA Insaat Taahhut ve Ticaret A.S.
Represented By: Alexandra Elena Busch, Busch
Represented By: Stephen M Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosmopolitan Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?