Ekstrom et al v. Congressional Bank
Plaintiff: Timothy Ekstrom and Davida Carnahan
Defendant: Congressional Bank
Case Number: 1:2020cv01501
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 12:2607
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Congressional Bank (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Sadler, John)
July 29, 2020 Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Congressional Bank identifying Corporate Parent Congressional Bancshares, Inc. for Congressional Bank.(Sadler, John)
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Lamb on behalf of Congressional Bank (Lamb, Matthew)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Congressional Bank answer due 7/29/2020. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/15/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Congressional Bank (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sadler, John)
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Davida Carnahan, Timothy Ekstrom. Congressional Bank served on 6/8/2020, answer due 6/29/2020.(Smith, Michael)
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Lynn English on behalf of Davida Carnahan, Timothy Ekstrom (English, Melissa)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 QC NOTICE: #5 Notice of Appearance filed by Davida Carnahan, Timothy Ekstrom was filed incorrectly. **Each attorney must file their Notice of Appearance using their CM/ECF login to be added as counsel to a case. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Paul Smith on behalf of Davida Carnahan, Timothy Ekstrom (Smith, Michael)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Paul Smith on behalf of Davida Carnahan, Timothy Ekstrom (Smith, Michael) Modified on 6/9/2020 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Francis Maloney on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Maloney, Timothy)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Veronica Byam Nannis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Nannis, Veronica)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Congressional Bank.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Congressional Bank ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8686318.), filed by Davida Carnahan, Timothy Ekstrom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Summons Summons)(Smith, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ekstrom et al v. Congressional Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Congressional Bank
Represented By: Matthew D. Lamb
Represented By: John Darren Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Ekstrom
Represented By: Michael Paul Smith
Represented By: Timothy Francis Maloney
Represented By: Veronica Byam Nannis
Represented By: Melissa Lynn English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davida Carnahan
Represented By: Michael Paul Smith
Represented By: Timothy Francis Maloney
Represented By: Veronica Byam Nannis
Represented By: Melissa Lynn English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?