McRaney v. Stolle et al
Plaintiff: Will McRaney
Defendant: Thomas Winborn, Baptist Convention of Maryland/Deleware, Inc., Steve Fehrman and Tom Stolle
Case Number: 1:2020cv01970
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE by Tom Stolle re #1 Notice of Removal, Supplement to Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Kane, Deborah)
August 18, 2020 Filing 28 Correspondence received from Will McRaney. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 27 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Will McRaney. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2020 Filing 26 Correspondence received from Will McRaney. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #24 Stipulation of Dismissal as to defendant Steve Fehrman. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/10/2020. (c/m 8/10/2020 bas, Deputy Clerk) .
August 7, 2020 Filing 24 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Steve Fehrman(Kane, Deborah)
August 6, 2020 Filing 23 Rule 12/56 notice mailed to Will McRaney (c/m 8/6/2020 bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 5, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by Tom Stolle (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Kane, Deborah)
August 5, 2020 Filing 21 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Baptist Convention of Maryland/Deleware, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Baptist Convention of Maryland/Delaware for Baptist Convention of Maryland/Deleware, Inc..(Kane, Deborah)
August 5, 2020 Filing 20 QC NOTICE: #19 Notice (Other) filed by Baptist Convention of Maryland/Deleware, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **It must be filed using the event 'Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement' located under 'Other Filings' and select 'Other Documents'. You must list all corporate affiliates when using this event.. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 29, 2020 Filing 19 -[FILED IN ERROR]- NOTICE by Baptist Convention of Maryland/Deleware, Inc. Disclosure of Corporate Interest (Kane, Deborah) Modified on 8/5/2020 (bas, Deputy Clerk).
July 16, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE re #6 Standing Order Concerning Removal Defendants' Statement Per Standing Order filed by Baptist Convention of Maryland/Deleware, Inc., Steve Fehrman, Tom Stolle, Thomas Winborn.(Kane, Deborah)
July 13, 2020 Filing 17 Rule 12/56 notice mailed to Will McRaney (c/m 7/13/2020 bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 10, 2020 Filing 16 Request for Hearing re #15 MOTION to Dismiss (Kane, Deborah)
July 10, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Thomas Winborn (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kane, Deborah)
July 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Elizabeth S Kane on behalf of Thomas Winborn (Kane, Deborah)
July 10, 2020 Filing 13 Request for Hearing re #12 MOTION to Dismiss (Kane, Deborah)
July 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Steve Fehrman (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kane, Deborah)
July 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Elizabeth S Kane on behalf of Steve Fehrman (Kane, Deborah)
July 10, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Hearing re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Kane, Deborah)
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Baptist Convention of Maryland/Deleware, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kane, Deborah)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Elizabeth S Kane on behalf of Baptist Convention of Maryland/Deleware, Inc. (Kane, Deborah)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 Removal Notification Letter sent to Plaintiff. (c/m 7/7/2020 bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/6/2020. (c/m 7/7/2020 bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 6, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR HOWARD COUNTY. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal by Tom Stolle (bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Baptist Convention of Maryland/Deleware, Inc., Steve Fehrman, Tom Stolle, Thomas Winborn, filed by Will McRaney.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Tom Stolle Civil Cover Sheet (Kane, Deborah)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Elizabeth S Kane on behalf of Tom Stolle (Kane, Deborah)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Howard County Circuit Court, case number C-13-CV-20-000376. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8735915), filed by Tom Stolle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Kane, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McRaney v. Stolle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Winborn
Represented By: Deborah Elizabeth S Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Convention of Maryland/Deleware, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah Elizabeth S Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Fehrman
Represented By: Deborah Elizabeth S Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Stolle
Represented By: Deborah Elizabeth S Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Will McRaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?