Oates v. Sands et al
Plaintiff: Emanuel David Joshua Oates
Defendant: Officer First Class Waugh and Officer First Class Sands
Case Number: 1:2020cv02074
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 Report re: Deposition hours (Inman, Darragh)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 1/6/2021. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/24/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sands, Waugh.(Sakles, Christopher)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Lee Rosenstein on behalf of Emanuel David Joshua Oates (Rosenstein, Justin)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Sands and Waugh. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(slss, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Emanuel Oates of Request to Issue Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Inman, Darragh)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8757556.), filed by Emanuel Oates. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Inman, Darragh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oates v. Sands et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer First Class Waugh
Represented By: Christopher Constantine Sakles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer First Class Sands
Represented By: Christopher Constantine Sakles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emanuel David Joshua Oates
Represented By: Darragh L Inman
Represented By: Justin Lee Rosenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?