Henderson et al v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sharon Henderson, Klyde Henderson and Clyde Henderson
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02081
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/9/20, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 68. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/2/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2020.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
September 2, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Seal SmIth & Nephew, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery and Motion for Sanctions by Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
September 2, 2020 Filing 23 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re (2255 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) MOTION to Compel Discovery and Motion for Sanctions from Defendant Smith & Nephew filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
September 2, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth C Curtin on behalf of Smith & Nephew, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Curtin, Elizabeth)
September 1, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
August 28, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/26/20, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number (410) 962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 30. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/18/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/28/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2020.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
August 28, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION Regarding Briefing Schedule by Smith & Nephew Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Reiskin, Terri)
August 21, 2020 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for August 26, 2020 Status Conference by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
August 17, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
August 12, 2020 Filing 16 -SEALED- MOTION to Compel Discovery and Motion for Sanctions from Defendant Smith & Nephew by In re: Smith & Nephew Birmingham Hip Resurfacing (BHR) Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Jenner, Robert)
August 4, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Smith & Nephew, Inc., filed by Sharon Henderson, Clyde Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ayala, Thomas)
August 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases as of 08/02/2020), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases as of 08/02/2020))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.16 Amending CMO 14 and Superseding CMO 15 (Pretrial Scheduling Order for BHR & THA Track Cases. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/30/2020. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 29, 2020 Filing 12 Joint Correspondence re: Joint Proposed Amended Case Management Order No. 16 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Clean, #2 Text of Proposed Order Redline)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Reiskin, Terri)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (2207) Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel in case 1:17-md-02775-CCB. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/27/2020. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in all actions Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/27/2020. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/22/20, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 70. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/14/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/24/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/22/2020.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Confirming in part the results of today's status conference. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/22/2020 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A Spira on behalf of Smith & Nephew, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Spira, Daniel)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Seal Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel [Dkt. 2218] by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re (2207 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Smith & Nephew filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay re (2208 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion to Stay Response in Opposition to Smith & Nephew's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to Respond by In re: Smith & Nephew Birmingham Hip Resurfacing (BHR) Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Jenner, Robert)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for July 22, 2020 Status Conference by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
July 16, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Smith & Nephew, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8757934.), filed by Sharon Henderson, Klyde Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ayala, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson et al v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Henderson
Represented By: Thomas V Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klyde Henderson
Represented By: Thomas V Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Henderson
Represented By: Thomas V Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?