Fillmore v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: John Fillmore
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv02098
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Referring Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER STAYING and administratively closing this case. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/17/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Stay of Proceedings Pending Appraisal by Safeco Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lambert, Patricia)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #12 Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/5/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 5, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Safeco Insurance Company of America(Lambert, Patricia)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MARGINAL ORDER granting #10 Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Engage in Discussion Regarding Potential Alternative Dispute Resolution Mechanisms. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/29/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time TO ENGAGE IN DISCUSSION REGARDING POTENTIAL ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION MECHANISMS by Safeco Insurance Company of America(Lambert, Patricia)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MARGINAL ORDER approving #8 Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/24/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Safeco Insurance Company of America.(Lambert, Patricia)
July 21, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Judge Catherine C. Blake no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.5(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lambert, Patricia)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Safeco Insurance Company of America Statement of Filing and Service of Notification of Removal (Lambert, Patricia)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America was filed incorrectly. **Please file the Notice of Filing Notice of Removal. Notice/Notice Other/Attach Document/Title It As: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal/DO NOT LINK. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR HARFORD COUNTY. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 STATE COURT Summons Issued as to Safeco Insurance Company of America.(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Safeco Insurance Company of America, filed by John Fillmore.(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Safeco Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation for Safeco Insurance Company of America.(Lambert, Patricia)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Maryland Harford County, case number C-12-CV-20-000420. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8760556), filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 State Court Plaintiff Jury Demand, #4 State Court Writ of Summons)(Lambert, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fillmore v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Kathryn D. Jackson
Represented By: Patricia McHugh Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Fillmore
Represented By: Laura Campbell Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?