Bussey et al v. Mid-Atlantic Commercial Law Group, PLLC et al
Plaintiff: Donnette Bussey, Victoria Yarborough and David Hill
Defendant: Mid-Atlantic Commercial Law Group, PLLC and Michele S. Cumberland
Case Number: 1:2020cv02178
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Clerk to close the case, in light of the Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice filed. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 9/23/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Donnette Bussey, David Hill, Victoria Yarborough (Ortega, Chelsea)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Michele S. Cumberland, Mid-Atlantic Commercial Law Group, PLLC.(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8775842.), filed by Donnette Bussey, David Hill, Victoria Yarborough. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons for Mid-Atlantic Commercial Law Group, PLLC, #3 Summons Summons for Michele S. Cumberland)(Ortega, Chelsea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bussey et al v. Mid-Atlantic Commercial Law Group, PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnette Bussey
Represented By: Chelsea Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Yarborough
Represented By: Chelsea Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hill
Represented By: Chelsea Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Atlantic Commercial Law Group, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele S. Cumberland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?