Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Phillips et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Somerset Hospitality, Inc. doing business as M Street Grille and Brandon Phillips individually, and as an officer, director, shareholder, member and/or principal of Somerset Hospitality, Inc. d/b/a M Street Grille
Case Number: 1:2020cv02261
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #8 Status Report Submitted filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/1/2020. (val, Chambers)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Status Report Submitted by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Hollimon, Justin)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Hollimon, Justin)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an serve by mail a motion for entry of default by the Clerk and a motion for default judgment, or provide a report why such motions would be inappropriate. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/10/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Somerset Hospitality, Inc. served on 8/11/2020, answer due 9/1/2020.(Hollimon, Justin)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Brandon Phillips and Somerset Hospitality, Inc.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 0416-8794680(Hollimon, Justin)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 QC NOTICE: Address for Attorney Justin Michael Hollimon. **Please update your attorney information to include the full mailing address. Make address change by selecting Utilities > Your Account > Manage Your Account. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order The case of Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Phillips et al, has been opened in the District of Maryland. The case number is SAG-20-2261. PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within 48 hours. To pay online, select the event Civil Case Filing Fee which is found under Civil Events --> Other Filings --> Other Documents. Otherwise, forward a check made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court and note the assigned case number on the check or cover letter. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Hollimon, Justin)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brandon Phillips, Somerset Hospitality d/b/a M Street Grille, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons Request, #3 Summons Summons Request)(Hollimon, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Phillips et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Somerset Hospitality, Inc. doing business as M Street Grille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Phillips individually, and as an officer, director, shareholder, member and/or principal of Somerset Hospitality, Inc. d/b/a M Street Grille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Michael Hollimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?