Alston v. Baltimore Gas & Electric Company et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Alston
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union 410, Exelon Corporation, Exelon Business Services Company, LLC, Baltimore Gas & Electric Company and Patrick Gilden
Case Number: 1:2020cv02317
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #27 MOTION to Remand . Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/7/2020. (vals, Chambers)
October 7, 2020 Filing 28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION to Remand by Baltimore Gas & Electric Company, Exelon Business Services Company, LLC, Exelon Corporation, Patrick Gilden, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union 410.(Joyce, Charles)
September 29, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Remand by Kevin Alston (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B-1)(Bana, Tonya)
September 28, 2020 Filing 26 Correspondence re: Requesting the Granting of Motions to Dismiss (Joyce, Charles)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #24 Request for Extension of Time to File filed by Kevin Alston. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/24/2020. (vals, Chambers)
September 23, 2020 Filing 24 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File (Bana, Tonya)
September 23, 2020 Filing 23 Correspondence re: Plaintiff's Failure to File Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Chowdhry, Kaiser)
September 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/19/2020. (Gallagher, Stephanie)
September 18, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #18 MOTION to Dismiss by Kevin Alston.(Bana, Tonya)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/11/2020. (Gallagher, Stephanie)
September 11, 2020 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #18 MOTION to Dismiss by Kevin Alston.(Bana, Tonya)
August 28, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Baltimore Gas & Electric Company, Exelon Business Services Company, LLC, Exelon Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, Declaration of Julia S. Sturniolo, #3 Exhibit A-1, Interim Complaint Procedure, #4 Exhibit A-2, Transition Agreement, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Chowdhry, Kaiser)
August 28, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Patrick Gilden, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union 410 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Ex. A (ICP Form), #3 Exhibit Ex. B (ICP Transition Agreement), #4 Exhibit Ex. C (NLRB Decision), #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Starr, Paul)
August 20, 2020 Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Julia S Sturniolo. Directing attorney Julia S Sturniolo to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/20/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Julia S. Sturniolo by Baltimore Gas & Electric Company, Exelon Business Services Company, LLC, Exelon Corporation. The fee has already been paid.(Chowdhry, Kaiser)
August 17, 2020 Filing 14 QC NOTICE: #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Exelon Business Services Company, LLC, Exelon Corporation, Baltimore Gas & Electric Company needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Charles T Joyce. Directing attorney Charles T Joyce to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/17/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2020 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union 410 (Starr, Paul)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Julia S. Sturniolo (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8807427.) by Baltimore Gas & Electric Company, Exelon Business Services Company, LLC, Exelon Corporation(Chowdhry, Kaiser)
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Baltimore Gas & Electric Company, Exelon Business Services Company, LLC, Exelon Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Exelon Corporation for Baltimore Gas & Electric Company, Exelon Business Services Company, LLC.(Chowdhry, Kaiser)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/13/2020. (vals, Chambers)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Complaint, by Baltimore Gas & Electric Company, Exelon Business Services Company, LLC, Exelon Corporation, Patrick Gilden, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union 410(Chowdhry, Kaiser)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #4 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Baltimore Gas & Electric Company, Exelon Business Services Company, LLC, Exelon Corporation, Patrick Gilden, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union 410.(Chowdhry, Kaiser)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Charles T. Joyce (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8806222.) by Patrick Gilden, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union 410(Starr, Paul)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Douglas Starr on behalf of Patrick Gilden, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union 410 (Starr, Paul)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/11/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Baltimore Gas & Electric Company, Exelon Business Services Company, LLC, Exelon Corporation, Patrick Gilden, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union 410, filed by Kevin Alston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Information Report)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.5(a)(Chowdhry, Kaiser)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, Maryland, case number 24-C-20-002543. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8801833), filed by Exelon Business Services Company, LLC, Exelon Corporation, Baltimore Gas & Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Case Information Report, #4 Exhibit D - Circuit Court Docket Report, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit F - Consent to Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chowdhry, Kaiser)
August 11, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (krs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alston v. Baltimore Gas & Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union 410
Represented By: Paul Douglas Starr
Represented By: Charles T Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exelon Corporation
Represented By: Kaiser H Chowdhry
Represented By: Julia S Sturniolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exelon Business Services Company, LLC
Represented By: Kaiser H Chowdhry
Represented By: Julia S Sturniolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore Gas & Electric Company
Represented By: Kaiser H Chowdhry
Represented By: Julia S Sturniolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Gilden
Represented By: Paul Douglas Starr
Represented By: Charles T Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Alston
Represented By: Tonya M Bana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?