Altman v. Saul
Plaintiff: Robby Allen Altman
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Notify
Case Number: 1:2020cv02370
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L. Boardman
Referring Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued 60 days as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/21/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Paperless order referring case to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman for pretrial management and report and recommendations pursuant to Standing Order 2014-01. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/18/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robby Allen Altman(Murahari, Arjun)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robby Allen Altman, filed by Robby Allen Altman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Murahari, Arjun)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altman v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robby Allen Altman
Represented By: Arjun Kuncham Murahari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notify
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?