Knox v. Saul
Plaintiff: Shantel Knox
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: SSA Notify
Case Number: 1:2020cv02395
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L. Boardman
Referring Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued 60 days as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing counsel to effectuate service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 8/25/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shantel Knox (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Schlitz, Paul)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 QC NOTICE: #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shantel Knox was filed incorrectly. **Plaintiff is directed to refile IFP Motion. Initial documents will not open. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman for all Proceedings. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 8/21/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Kelly M Marzullo on behalf of Andrew Saul (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Schlitz, Paul)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shantel Knox (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Schlitz, Paul)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Shantel Knox. (Attachments: #1 ALJ Decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Schlitz, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knox v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Kelly M Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notify
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shantel Knox
Represented By: Paul Rodney Schlitz, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?