Aronstein et al v. Lowe's Home Improvement, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Allen Aronstein and Patty Soppe
Defendant: Low's Home Improvement, LLC, Lowe's Home Centers, LLC and Lowe's Home Improvement, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02396
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Referring Judge: Beth P Gesner
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Carson, Sandra)
September 14, 2020 Filing 16 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Quinn, Jeffrey)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re: Informal Discovery Dispute Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 9/14/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re: Referral. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 9/14/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 9/10/2020. (daws, Chambers)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner for all Proceedings and Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/9/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Marginal ORDER Approving #10 Correspondence re: Initial Report Concerning Extension of Court Deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/9/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 Correspondence re: Initial Report concerning extension of Court deadlines (Quinn, Jeffrey)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #6 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Lowe's Home Improvement, LLC.(Carson, Sandra)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 1/8/2021. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Letter) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Lowe's Home Improvement, LLC.(Carson, Sandra)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/20/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR ANNE ARUNDEL COUNTY. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued 30 days as to Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Lowe's Home Improvement, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Lowe's Home Improvement, LLC, filed by Allen Aronstein, Patty Soppe. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lowe's Companies, Inc. for Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(Carson, Sandra)
August 19, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Low's Home Improvement, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lowe's Companies, Inc. for Low's Home Improvement, LLC.(Carson, Sandra)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County, Maryland, case number C-02-CV-20-001477. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8815750). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #6 Exhibit State Court Summons to Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, #7 Exhibit State Court Summons to Lowe's Home Improvement, LLC, #8 Exhibit State Court Certificate of Service of Discovery)(Carson, Sandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aronstein et al v. Lowe's Home Improvement, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Aronstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patty Soppe
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Low's Home Improvement, LLC
Represented By: Sandra Tofte Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Sandra Tofte Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Improvement, LLC
Represented By: Sandra Tofte Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?