Eason, et al v. CR Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Sheila Preissler, Carissa Douglas, Betty McCoy, Pamela Rowland, Robert Linnar, Arnetha Henderson, Veletta Gardner, Deloris Montgomery, Richard Barbour and Colette Eason
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc., Does 1 through 100 inclusive, McKesson Corporation and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02397
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #32 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 10/8/2020. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #34 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's local counsel has until October 16, 2020 to Enter an Appearance. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 10/8/2020. (tb2s, Chambers)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #31 Stipulation of Dismissal of Claims Against McKesson Corporation Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 10/8/2020. (tb2s, Chambers)
September 17, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to Extend Time for Local Counsel to Enter an Appearance by Betty McCoy. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2020 Filing 33 Joint MOTION to Stay Joint Motion to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Halaiko, Michael)
September 11, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Melissa Dorman Matthews & Jordan E. Jarreau by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., McKesson Corporation(Halaiko, Michael)
September 11, 2020 Filing 31 STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation to Dismiss Claims Against McKesson Corporation Without Prejudice by McKesson Corporation(Halaiko, Michael)
September 11, 2020 Filing 30 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Becton, Dickinson & Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc..(Halaiko, Michael)
September 11, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Leianne S McEvoy on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., McKesson Corporation (McEvoy, Leianne)
September 11, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Halaiko on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., McKesson Corporation (Halaiko, Michael)
August 24, 2020 Filing 27 Transfer Notification Letter sent to all Counsel. (cm 8/24/2020 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2020 Filing 26 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02263. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #20 Unopposed Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Carissa Douglas's case be severed and transferred to the Oakland Division of the Northern District of California (Civil case 3:20-cv-2259-S opened); b. Plaintiff Veletta Gardner's case be severed and transferred to the West Palm Beach Division of the Southern District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2260-S opened); c. Plaintiff Arnetha Henderson's case be severed and transferred to the Bay City Division of the Eastern District of Michigan (Civil case 3:20-cv-2261-S opened); d. Plaintiff Robert Linnar's case be severed and transferred to the Southern Division of the Central District of California (Civil case 3:20-cv-2262-S opened); e. Plaintiff Betty McCoy' s case be severed and transferred to the Baltimore Division of the District of Maryland (Civil case 3:20-cv-2263-S opened); f. Plaintiff Deloris Montgomery's case be severed and transferred to the Florence Division of the District of South Carolina (Civil case 3:20-cv-2264-S opened); g. Plaintiff Sheila Preissler's case be severed and transferred to the Tampa Division of the Middle District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2265-S opened); h. Plaintiff Pamela Rowland's case be severed and transferred to the Little Rock Division of the Eastern District of Arkansas (Civil case 3:20-cv-2266-S opened). Plaintiff Colette Eason is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/18/2020) (axm)
August 14, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc re: #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation re: #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa)
July 29, 2020 Filing 22 Appendix in Support filed by Richard Barbour, Carissa Douglas, Colette Eason, Veletta Gardner, Arnetha Henderson, Robert Linnar, Betty McCoy, Deloris Montgomery, Sheila Preissler, Pamela Rowland re #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven)
July 29, 2020 Filing 21 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Richard Barbour, Carissa Douglas, Colette Eason, Veletta Gardner, Arnetha Henderson, Robert Linnar, Betty McCoy, Deloris Montgomery, Sheila Preissler, Pamela Rowland re #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
July 29, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Richard Barbour, Carissa Douglas, Colette Eason, Veletta Gardner, Arnetha Henderson, Robert Linnar, Betty McCoy, Deloris Montgomery, Sheila Preissler, Pamela Rowland (Schulte, Steven)
July 29, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE filed by Richard Barbour, Carissa Douglas, Colette Eason, Veletta Gardner, Arnetha Henderson, Robert Linnar, Betty McCoy, Deloris Montgomery, Sheila Preissler, Pamela Rowland re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Responses) (Matthews, Melissa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff re: #16 Notice (Other), filed by Richard Barbour, Carissa Douglas, Colette Eason, Veletta Gardner, Arnetha Henderson, Robert Linnar, Betty McCoy, Deloris Montgomery, Sheila Preissler, Pamela Rowland (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Richard Barbour, Carissa Douglas, Colette Eason, Veletta Gardner, Arnetha Henderson, Robert Linnar, Betty McCoy, Deloris Montgomery, Sheila Preissler, Pamela Rowland (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before 7/22/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (mla)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf)
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Richard Barbour, Carissa Douglas, Colette Eason, Veletta Gardner, Arnetha Henderson, Robert Linnar, Betty McCoy, Deloris Montgomery, Sheila Preissler, Pamela Rowland (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica)
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Junek, Jessica)
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 10 replaced with the flattened document on 6/17/2020) (pnp).
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica)
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation Attorney Jessica Junek added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft) (Junek, Jessica)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 7 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc).
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CR Bard Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 6 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc).
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The above-referenced matter is transferred to the docket of the Honorable Judge Karen Gren Scholer, who has a related case. All future pleadings shall be filed under case number 3:20-CV-1480-S. Judge David C Godbey no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/9/2020) (twd)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc, re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa) Modified Docket Text on 6/9/2020 (oyh).
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc (Matthews, Melissa) Modified Docket Text on 6/9/2020 (oyh).
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by CR Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10897473) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson Corporation, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued to C.R. Bard, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued to McKesson Corporation, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Notice of Initial Dismissal Hearing, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Return of Service - C.R. Bard, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral, #17 Exhibit(s) D-11 - Notice of Initial Dismissal Hearing) (Matthews, Melissa) Modified Docket Text on 6/9/2020 (oyh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eason, et al v. CR Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Preissler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carissa Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Linnar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnetha Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veletta Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deloris Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Barbour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colette Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Leianne S McEvoy
Represented By: Michael J Halaiko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Leianne S McEvoy
Represented By: Michael J Halaiko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Leianne S McEvoy
Represented By: Michael J Halaiko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?