Thompson v. Quinn
Plaintiff: Christopher K Thompson
Defendant: Kayla Dee Quinn
Case Number: 1:2020cv02400
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Referring Judge: Beth P Gesner
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 16 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Wilson, Charles)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re Informal Discovery Dispute Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 9/25/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Directing defendant to file a Magistrate Judge consent forms no later than October 8, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 9/25/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 9/24/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner for All Further Proceedings. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/24/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite for Mediation. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/24/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 QC NOTICE: #8 Notice (Other) filed by Kayla Dee Quinn was filed incorrectly. **The incorrect civil event was used. Please re-file using the event Magistrate Judge - consent to located under Civil, Other Filings, and then Correspondence.. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 1/21/2021. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/22/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 22, 2020 Telephone Conference re: Scheduling Conference held on 9/22/2020 before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (kams, Deputy Clerk)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 -[FILED IN ERROR]- NOTICE by Kayla Dee Quinn Consent to Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate Judge (Wilson, Charles) Modified on 9/23/2020 (bas, Deputy Clerk).
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Smith, Jonathan)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 MISCELLANEOUS Correspondence to counsel advising of a conference call to discuss the attached proposed scheduling order. Counsel are requested to confirm with Chambers their participation. (Blake, Catherine)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kayla Dee Quinn. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Local Rule 103(3)(b))(Wilson, Charles)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Kayla Dee Quinn.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Christopher K Thompson re #1 Complaint Summons (Smith, Jonathan)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Christopher K Thompson was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 Complaint. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2020 Jury Trial Demand by Christopher K Thompson(bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Kayla Dee Quinn ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8816847.), filed by Christopher K Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher K Thompson
Represented By: Jonathan Scott Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayla Dee Quinn
Represented By: Charles Elliott Wilson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?