Ramos Ramirez v. HKGDJ, INC. a/k/aMannarang Food Court et al
Plaintiff: Rolando Ramos Ramirez
Defendant: HKGDJ, INC. a/k/aMannarang Food Court and Jong Hwa Lee
Case Number: 1:2020cv02404
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MARGINAL ORDER approving #5 Request for Refund of Filing Fee. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/14/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Correspondence from Plaintiff re: Request for Refund of Filing Fee (ols, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Rolando Ramos Ramirez. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/3/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rolando Ramos Ramirez (Kurzyna, Mariusz)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Rolando Ramos Ramirez was filed incorrectly. **Please refile the complaint with the correct case number and the proper heading for this Court. The complaint has been marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 (FILED IN ERROR) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8817185.), filed by Rolando Ramos Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Request for Summons- KHGDJ, Inc. a/k/a Mannarang Food Court, #3 Summons Request for Summons- Jong Hwa Lee, #4 Attachment Request for Spoken Language Interpreter)(Kurzyna, Mariusz) Modified on 8/20/2020 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos Ramirez v. HKGDJ, INC. a/k/aMannarang Food Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HKGDJ, INC. a/k/aMannarang Food Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jong Hwa Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando Ramos Ramirez
Represented By: Mariusz Kurzyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?