Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A. et al v. Front Yard Residential Corporation
Plaintiff: Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A., Altisource S.. R.L. and Altisource S.A.R.L.
Defendant: Front Yard Residential Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv02412
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 Return Receipt Letter from the Clerk, Circuit Court for Baltimore City. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 Remand Letter to the Clerk, Circuit Court for Baltimore City. (c/m 9/17/20 bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Parties Joint Motion to Remand to Circuit Court for Baltimore City, Maryland. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 9/16/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by Front Yard Residential Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sampson, Douglas)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Front Yard Residential Corporation (Sampson, Douglas)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Front Yard Residential Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal (Sampson, Douglas)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Front Yard Residential Corporation was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - civil cover sheet. To correct this problem, file civil cover sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link civil cover sheet to #1 . (ko, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, Maryland, case number 24-C-20-003529. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8818272), filed by Front Yard Residential Corporation.(Sampson, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A. et al v. Front Yard Residential Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A.
Represented By: Brian D Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altisource S.. R.L.
Represented By: Brian D Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altisource S.A.R.L.
Represented By: Brian D Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Front Yard Residential Corporation
Represented By: Douglas Alan Sampson
Represented By: Charles O Monk, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?