Lucey v. Paucek et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Lacey and Thomas Lucey
Defendant: Coretha M. Rushing, Edward S. Macias, Harsha Mokkarala, Catherine A. Graham, Timothy M. Haley, Christopher J. Paucek, Earl Lewis, John M. Larson, Gregory K. Peters, Sallie L. Krawcheck, Valerie B. Jarrett, Mark J. Chernis, 2U, Inc., Alexis Maybank, Robert M. Stavis and Paul A. Maeder
Case Number: 1:2020cv02424
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Amanda Betsch. Directing attorney Amanda Betsch to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/28/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Amanda Betsch (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8880053.) by 2U, Inc., Mark J. Chernis, Catherine A. Graham, Timothy M. Haley, Valerie B. Jarrett, Sallie L. Krawcheck, John M. Larson, Earl Lewis, Edward S. Macias, Paul A. Maeder, Alexis Maybank, Harsha Mokkarala, Christopher J. Paucek, Gregory K. Peters, Coretha M. Rushing, Robert M. Stavis(Word, James)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James Christian Word on behalf of Mark J. Chernis, Timothy M. Haley, Valerie B. Jarrett, Sallie L. Krawcheck, John M. Larson, Earl Lewis, Edward S. Macias, Paul A. Maeder, Alexis Maybank, Harsha Mokkarala, Gregory K. Peters, Coretha M. Rushing, Robert M. Stavis (Word, James)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by 2U, Inc. (Word, James)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James Christian Word on behalf of 2U, Inc., Catherine A. Graham, Christopher J. Paucek (Word, James)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 9/3/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order regarding Stay of Case Pending Resolution of Motions to Dismiss Related Securities Class Action (Joint) by 2U, Inc., Mark J. Chernis, Catherine A. Graham, Timothy M. Haley, Valerie B. Jarrett, Sallie L. Krawcheck, John M. Larson, Earl Lewis, Edward S. Macias, Paul A. Maeder, Alexis Maybank, Harsha Mokkarala, Christopher J. Paucek, Gregory K. Peters, Coretha M. Rushing, Robert M. Stavis(Word, James)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Thomas Lacey (Radding, Andrew)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: Disclosure of Corporate Interest filed by Thomas Lacey was filed incorrectly. **Disclosure of Corporate Interest was filed as an attachment to Complaint. Please re-file using the civil event Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement found in the "other filings" category under "other documents". The attachment only has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to 2U, Inc., Mark J. Chernis, Catherine A. Graham, Timothy M. Haley, Valerie B. Jarrett, Sallie L. Krawcheck, John M. Larson, Earl Lewis, Edward S. Macias, Paul A. Maeder, Alexis Maybank, Harsha Mokkarala, Christopher J. Paucek, Gregory K. Peters, Coretha M. Rushing, Robert M. Stavis. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8821132.), filed by Thomas Lacey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 (Filed in Error) Disclosure of Corporate Interest, #3 Summons Defendant Paucek, #4 Summons Defendant Graham, #5 Summons Defendant Mokkarala, #6 Summons Defendant Maeder, #7 Summons Defendant Stavis, #8 Summons Defendant Peters, #9 Summons Defendant Haley, #10 Summons Defendant Jarrett, #11 Summons Defendant Lewis, #12 Summons Defendant Rushing, #13 Summons Defendant Krawcheck, #14 Summons Defendant Larson, #15 Summons Defendant Macias, #16 Summons Defendant Maybank, #17 Summons Defendant Chernis, #18 Summons Defendant 2U, Inc.)(Radding, Andrew) Modified on 8/24/2020 (dass, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucey v. Paucek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coretha M. Rushing
Represented By: Amanda Betsch
Represented By: James Christian Word
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward S. Macias
Represented By: Amanda Betsch
Represented By: James Christian Word
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harsha Mokkarala
Represented By: Amanda Betsch
Represented By: James Christian Word
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine A. Graham
Represented By: Amanda Betsch
Represented By: James Christian Word
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy M. Haley
Represented By: Amanda Betsch
Represented By: James Christian Word
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher J. Paucek
Represented By: Amanda Betsch
Represented By: James Christian Word
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Lewis
Represented By: Amanda Betsch
Represented By: James Christian Word
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Larson
Represented By: Amanda Betsch
Represented By: James Christian Word
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory K. Peters
Represented By: Amanda Betsch
Represented By: James Christian Word
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sallie L. Krawcheck
Represented By: Amanda Betsch
Represented By: James Christian Word
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie B. Jarrett
Represented By: Amanda Betsch
Represented By: James Christian Word
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark J. Chernis
Represented By: Amanda Betsch
Represented By: James Christian Word
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2U, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Betsch
Represented By: James Christian Word
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis Maybank
Represented By: Amanda Betsch
Represented By: James Christian Word
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Stavis
Represented By: Amanda Betsch
Represented By: James Christian Word
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul A. Maeder
Represented By: Amanda Betsch
Represented By: James Christian Word
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Lacey
Represented By: Andrew Radding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Lucey
Represented By: Andrew Radding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?