Turpin v. Shellingberger et al
Plaintiff: Kevin De'Andre Turpin
Defendant: John Doe (2), Fruitland Police Dept., Heather Shellingberger and John Doe (1)
Case Number: 1:2020cv02516
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement as to Kevin De'Andre Turpin(bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kevin De'Andre Turpin(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel; giving Finance Officer 21 days from the date of this Order to submit an inmate account summary for the past six months of the Plaintiffs incarceration. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/25/2020. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-09/25/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kevin De'Andre Turpin(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kevin De'Andre Turpin(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe (1), John Doe (2), Fruitland Police Dept., Heather Shellingberger, filed by Kevin De'Andre Turpin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jb5, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turpin v. Shellingberger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fruitland Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Shellingberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin De'Andre Turpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?