Kaplan Development Group, LLC v. Goodman Company, LP
Plaintiff: Kaplan Development Group, LLC
Defendant: Goodman Company, LP
Case Number: 1:2020cv02591
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk to close the case. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 11/5/2020. (c/em 11/6/20 bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel by Kaplan Development Group, LLC. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the CPSC to submit a response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 10/15/2020. (c/em & c/m 10/15/20 bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Enforce Subpoena Served on Non-Party Consumer Product Safety Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Cover Letter)(Originally received 9/8/20) (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaplan Development Group, LLC v. Goodman Company, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodman Company, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaplan Development Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?