Harrell v. Caterpillar Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Blanche S Harrell
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Uniroyal, Inc., Honeywell, Inc., Borg Warner Corporation, Foseco, Inc., Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, Meritor, Inc., Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc. and Honeywell International Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02622
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to #13 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Honeywell International Inc..(Huber, Jonathan)
October 23, 2020 Filing 24 CROSSCLAIM against All Parties, filed by Arvinmeritor, Inc..(Lawler, Katherine)
October 23, 2020 Filing 23 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Arvinmeritor, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Meritor, Inc. for Arvinmeritor, Inc..(Lawler, Katherine)
October 20, 2020 Filing 22 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Foseco, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Foseco Holding, Inc. for Foseco, Inc..(Cellucci, Laura)
October 20, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, by Foseco, Inc..(Cellucci, Laura)
October 19, 2020 Deficiency Notice to Arvinmeritor, Inc. Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 10/26/2020 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, by Arvinmeritor, Inc..(Lawler, Katherine)
October 9, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Meringer, Donald)
October 9, 2020 Filing 18 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Caterpillar Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Insurance Company of North America for Caterpillar Inc., Caterpillar Inc., Caterpillar Inc., Caterpillar Inc., Caterpillar Inc..(Mantzavinos, Megan)
October 9, 2020 Filing 17 QC NOTICE: #15 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement needs to be refiled. Everyone designated on your disclosure statement as having financial interest in the outcome of the case needs to be added as a corporate parent or other affiliate when the system prompts you. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 QC NOTICE: #10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Caterpillar Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement needs to be refiled. Everyone designated on your disclosure statement as having financial interest in the outcome of the case needs to be added as a corporate parent or other affiliate when the system prompts you. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 9, 2020 Filing 15 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Carlisle Companies Incorporated, Other Affiliate Motion Control Industries, Inc. for Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc..(Meringer, Donald) Modified on 10/9/2020 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, by Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc..(Meringer, Donald)
October 9, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Caterpillar Inc..(Mantzavinos, Megan)
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 QC NOTICE: #11 Answer to Complaint and Crossclaim filed by Caterpillar Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Wrong document attached. Please refile your Answer and Crossclaim. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 (FILED IN ERROR) ANSWER to #3 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Caterpillar Inc. (Mantzavinos, Megan) Modified on 10/9/2020 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Caterpillar Inc. (Mantzavinos, Megan) Modified on 10/9/2020 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Trocki Mantzavinos on behalf of Caterpillar Inc. (Mantzavinos, Megan)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Continental Casualty Company, Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Other Affiliate International Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Granite State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Interstate Fire & Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Other Affiliate American Employers' Insurance Company, Other Affiliate National Surety Corporation, Other Affiliate Industrial Indemnity, Other Affiliate AIU Insurance Company, Other Affiliate American ReInsurance Company, Other Affiliate Midland Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Northbrook Excess and Surplus Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Transit Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Northbrook Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Allianz Underwriters, Inc., Other Affiliate American Excess Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Employers Insurance of Wausau, A Mutual Company, Other Affiliate Imperial Casualty and Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate London Market, Other Affiliate Safety Mutual Casualty Corp., Other Affiliate Transport Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Unigard Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Enstar Holdings (US) LLC, Other Affiliate Zurich International Limited, Hamilton, Bermuda, Other Affiliate Columbia Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Highlands Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Allianz Underwriters Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Harbor Insurance Company, Other Affiliate First State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate American Home Assurance Company, Other Affiliate Republic Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Lexington Insurance Company, Other Affiliate International Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Royal Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Aetna Casualty and Surety Company, Other Affiliate Continental Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Home Insurance Company for Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc..(Noorani, Michelle)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #4 Standing Order Concerning Removal Joint Statement filed by Honeywell International Inc..(Huber, Jonathan)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International Inc. (Huber, Jonathan)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International Inc. (Huber, Jonathan)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 9/14/2020. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Arvinmeritor, Inc., Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc., Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc., Caterpillar Inc., Foseco, Inc., Honeywell International Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, Uniroyal, Inc., filed by Blanche S Harrell.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2020 Case Assigned to Chief Judge James K. Bredar. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Honeywell, Inc..(Huber, Jonathan)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24x20000037. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8857662), filed by Honeywell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Notice of Filing Removal)(Huber, Jonathan) Modified on 9/14/2020 (ko, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrell v. Caterpillar Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanche S Harrell
Represented By: John Mark Williams, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Timothy Edmonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc.
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvinmeritor, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine A Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia N Ritchie
Represented By: Jonathan James Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg Warner Corporation
Represented By: Warren N Weaver
Represented By: Michelle Noorani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foseco, Inc.
Represented By: Laura A Cellucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc.
Represented By: Donald S Meringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meritor, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine A Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc.
Represented By: Warren N Weaver
Represented By: Michelle Noorani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Alicia N Ritchie
Represented By: Jonathan James Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?