Lay v. Caesars Entertainment Corporation
Plaintiff: Robert Anthony Lay
Defendant: Caesars Entertainment Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv02674
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Case Electronically Transferred to the USDC for the District of Nevada, Northern Division (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 21, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 14637124708 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Consent/Joint MOTION to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/21/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #8 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Caesars Entertainment Corporation.(Hebb, Robert)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Caesars Entertainment Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Caesars Entertainment, Inc. for Caesars Entertainment Corporation.(Hebb, Robert)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/17/2020. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2020 Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 9/22/2020 (slss, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 Consent/Joint MOTION to Transfer Case by Caesars Entertainment Corporation, Robert Anthony Lay (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(slss, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE to Adverse Party by Caesars Entertainment Corporation. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.5 Certificate by Caesars Entertainment Corporation (slss, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/17/2020 (slss, Deputy Clerk).
September 15, 2020 The above documents #2 through #4 are copies of filings in the Circuit Court for Baltimore City, Maryland. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Caesars Entertainment Corporation (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(slss, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued 60 days as to Caesars Entertainment Corporation.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Caesars Entertainment Corporation, filed by Robert Anthony Lay. (Attachments: #1 Lower Court Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Lower Court Docket Sheet)(slss, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, Maryland, case number 24-C-20-003055. ( Filing fee paid check #24337 $ 400), filed by Caesars Entertainment Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(slss, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2020: #2 Clerk Letter) (slss, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lay v. Caesars Entertainment Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caesars Entertainment Corporation
Represented By: Robert Leigh Hebb
Represented By: Richard J. Medoff
Represented By: Maurice Belmont VerStandig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Anthony Lay
Represented By: Richard J. Medoff
Represented By: Robert Leigh Hebb
Represented By: Maurice Belmont VerStandig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?